EP1032240 - ISDN communication apparatus with fall-back function [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-0092 / JP | [2010/35] |
Former [2000/35] | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-0092 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Odaira, Masahiro Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2000/35] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/33] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/35] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00103605.2 | 21.02.2000 | [2000/35] | Priority number, date | JP19990043433 | 22.02.1999 Original published format: JP 4343399 | [2000/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1032240 | Date: | 30.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1032240 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | [2006/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1032240 | Date: | 01.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/04 | [2000/35] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0457 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13103 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13106 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13156 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13166 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13167 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13176 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13179 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13199 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13204 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13209 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13213 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/1327 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2007/31] |
Former [2000/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | ISDN Kommunikationseinrichtung mit Rückfallfunktion | [2000/35] | English: | ISDN communication apparatus with fall-back function | [2000/35] | French: | Dispositif de communication RNIS avec fonction de repli | [2000/35] | Examination procedure | 29.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/28] | 24.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 16.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/32] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 16.07.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 16.07.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH10327309 (OKI DATA KK) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0094] - [0096] * * figures 12,13; claims 9,11 * * & US 7 075 683 B1 (EGUSHI HIROSHI ET AL) 11 July 2006 (2006-07-11); column 13, lines 24-42 * * column 16, lines 35-38 * * column 17, lines 18-25 * * figure 12; claims 9,11 *; | [X]JPH1032630 (CANON KK) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * figure 3 * | by applicant | JPH10327309 | JPH1032630 |