EP1034778 - Use of octocrylene to solubilise 2,4-bis-[4-(2-ethyl-hexyloxy)-2-hydroxy]-phenyl-6-(4-methoxyphenyl)-1,3,5-triazin in cosmetic or dermatologic radiation screening compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beiersdorf AG Unnastrasse 48 20253 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/22] | For all designated states Beiersdorf AG Unnastrasse 48 20253 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2000/37] | For all designated states Beiersdorf AG Unnastrasse 48 20245 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gers-Barlag, Heinrich, Dr. Kiebitzgrund 11 25495 Kummerfeld / DE | 02 /
Müller, Anja Wiesenstrasse 5 23843 Rümpel / DE | [2000/37] | Application number, filing date | 00103661.5 | 22.02.2000 | [2000/37] | Priority number, date | DE1999110477 | 10.03.1999 Original published format: DE 19910477 | [2000/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1034778 | Date: | 13.09.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1034778 | Date: | 16.08.2001 | [2001/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1034778 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/42 | [2000/37] | CPC: |
A61Q17/04 (EP,US);
A61K8/4966 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/37] | Title | German: | Verwendung von Octocrylen zur Solubilisierung von 2,4-Bis- [4-(2-Ethyl-hexyloxy)-2-hydroxy]-phenyl -6-(4-methoxyphenyl)-1,3,5-triazin in kosmetischen oder dermatologischen Lichtschutzmitteln | [2000/37] | English: | Use of octocrylene to solubilise 2,4-bis-[4-(2-ethyl-hexyloxy)-2-hydroxy]-phenyl-6-(4-methoxyphenyl)-1,3,5-triazin in cosmetic or dermatologic radiation screening compositions | [2000/37] | French: | Utilisation d'octocrylene pour solubiliser 2,4-bis-[4-(2-ethyl-hexyloxy)-2-hydroxy]-phenyl-6-(4-metho xyphenyl)-1,3,5-triazine dans des compositions cosmétiques ou dermatologiques photoprotectrices | [2000/37] | Examination procedure | 04.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/35] | 18.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 26.05.2004 | IE | 26.05.2004 | NL | 26.05.2004 | DK | 26.08.2004 | GR | 26.08.2004 | PT | 26.10.2004 | AT | 22.02.2005 | CY | 22.02.2005 | LU | 22.02.2005 | BE | 28.02.2005 | CH | 28.02.2005 | LI | 28.02.2005 | MC | 28.02.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/20] | FI | 26.05.2004 | |
IE | 26.05.2004 | ||
NL | 26.05.2004 | ||
DK | 26.08.2004 | ||
GR | 26.08.2004 | ||
AT | 22.02.2005 | ||
CY | 22.02.2005 | ||
LU | 22.02.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
CH | 28.02.2005 | ||
LI | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | FI | 26.05.2004 | |
IE | 26.05.2004 | ||
NL | 26.05.2004 | ||
DK | 26.08.2004 | ||
GR | 26.08.2004 | ||
AT | 22.02.2005 | ||
LU | 22.02.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
CH | 28.02.2005 | ||
LI | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/34] | FI | 26.05.2004 | |
IE | 26.05.2004 | ||
NL | 26.05.2004 | ||
DK | 26.08.2004 | ||
GR | 26.08.2004 | ||
AT | 22.02.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
CH | 28.02.2005 | ||
LI | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 26.05.2004 | |
IE | 26.05.2004 | ||
NL | 26.05.2004 | ||
DK | 26.08.2004 | ||
GR | 26.08.2004 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
CH | 28.02.2005 | ||
LI | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 26.05.2004 | |
IE | 26.05.2004 | ||
NL | 26.05.2004 | ||
DK | 26.08.2004 | ||
GR | 26.08.2004 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/19] | FI | 26.05.2004 | |
IE | 26.05.2004 | ||
DK | 26.08.2004 | ||
GR | 26.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 26.05.2004 | |
DK | 26.08.2004 | ||
GR | 26.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | FI | 26.05.2004 | |
GR | 26.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 26.05.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0685221 (OREAL [FR]) [Y] 1-4 * abstract * * page 3, line 18 - line 36 * * claim - *; | [Y]US5605679 (HANSENNE ISABELLE [FR], et al) [Y] 1-4 * column 2, line 32 - line 62 * * column 3, line 1 - line 8 * * column 4, line 17 - line 25 * * claim - *; | [Y]EP0775698 (CIBA GEIGY [CH]) [Y] 1-4 * abstract * * page 10; example 1 * * page 17; example 11 * * claim - *; | [A]EP0821941 (3V SIGMA SPA [IT]) [A] 1-4 * page 3, line 20 - line 23 ** claim - *; | [Y]WO9908653 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH], et al) [Y] 1-4 * page 10, paragraph L * * claim - * |