EP1042993 - Device for making dental impressions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2004 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hahn, Rainer, Dr. Schwabstrasse 11 72074 Tübingen / DE | [2000/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/41] | Representative(s) | Ostertag, Reinhard Ostertag & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Epplestraße 14 70597 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/41] | Ostertag, Reinhard Patentanwälte Dr. Ulrich Ostertag Dr. Reinhard Ostertag Eibenweg 10 70597 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 00103859.5 | 05.03.1997 | [2000/41] | Priority number, date | DE1996108546 | 06.03.1996 Original published format: DE 19608546 | DE1996127517 | 09.07.1996 Original published format: DE 19627517 | [2000/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1042993 | Date: | 11.10.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1042993 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61C9/00 | [2000/41] | CPC: |
A61C9/0006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [2000/41] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von Zahnabdrücken | [2000/41] | English: | Device for making dental impressions | [2000/41] | French: | Dispositif pour l' obtention d'empreintes dentaires | [2000/41] | Examination procedure | 24.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/41] | 05.06.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.06.2001 | Request for decision received: (all rights) | 23.07.2001 | Result of request for decision ((all rights)): Request accepted | 11.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97906170.2 / EP0884981 | Opposition(s) | 05.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 04.06.2003 | GB | 04.06.2003 | SE | 04.09.2003 | ES | 15.09.2003 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/22] | GB | 04.06.2003 | |
SE | 04.09.2003 | ||
ES | 15.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | SE | 04.09.2003 | |
ES | 15.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | ES | 15.09.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1437844 (HENDERSON HENRY J) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0519195 (SCHREINEMAKERS JOSEPHUS [NL]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE4130701 (BECKER WOLFGANG [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE9313561U (BECKER WOLFGANG [DE]) [DA] 1* the whole document * | by applicant | DE4130701 | DE9313561U |