EP1033354 - Foamed mineral building- and structual element, method for its production and apparatus for carrying out said method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/36] | Foamed mineral building- and structual element, method for the production of a mineral foam and apparatus for carrying out said method | ||
[2003/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.2004 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Niedner, Peter Dr. Max-Obermayr-Weg 3 83707 Bad Wiessee / DE | [2000/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Franke, Matthias, Dipl.-Ing. OT Friedewald 01468 Moritzburg / DE | 02 /
Niedner, Peter, Dr. ing. Max-Obermayr-Weg 3 83707 Bad Wiessee / DE | 03 /
Choyna, Kathrin Berggasse 14 09599 Freiberg / DE | [2000/41] |
Former [2000/36] | 01 /
Franke, Matthias, Dipl.-Ing. OT Friedewald 01468 Moritzburg / DE | ||
02 /
Niedner, Peter, Dr. ing. Max-Obermayr-Weg 3 83707 Bad Wiessee / DE | |||
03 /
Choyna, Karin Berggasse 14 09596 Freiberg / DE | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/36] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00103969.2 | 25.02.2000 | [2000/36] | Priority number, date | DE1999109077 | 02.03.1999 Original published format: DE 19909077 | [2000/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1033354 | Date: | 06.09.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1033354 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C04B28/26, C04B38/00, B28B1/50, B28B11/24 | [2000/36] | CPC: |
B28B11/24 (EP,US);
B28B1/50 (EP,US);
B28B5/027 (EP,US);
C04B28/26 (EP,US);
C04B38/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249953 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249969 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249976 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249978 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249986 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C04B28/26, C04B14/06, C04B14/38, C04B38/0051, C04B2103/48 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/36] | Title | German: | Mineralischer schaumförmiger Bau- und Strukturwerkstoff sowie Verfahren zur dessen Herstellung und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens | [2003/22] | English: | Foamed mineral building- and structual element, method for its production and apparatus for carrying out said method | [2003/22] | French: | Element de construction structural en mousse minérale, procédé de son fabrication et dispositif pour la mise en oeuvre de ce procédé | [2003/22] |
Former [2000/36] | Mineralischer schaumförmiger Bau- und Strukturwerkstoff sowie Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Mineralschaumes und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens | ||
Former [2000/36] | Foamed mineral building- and structual element, method for the production of a mineral foam and apparatus for carrying out said method | ||
Former [2000/36] | Element de construction structural en mousse minérale, procédé de fabrication d'une mousse minérale et dispositif pour la mise en oeuvre de ce procédé | Examination procedure | 27.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/17] | 28.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 07.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 21.01.2004 | ES | 21.01.2004 | FI | 21.01.2004 | FR | 21.01.2004 | IE | 21.01.2004 | IT | 21.01.2004 | NL | 21.01.2004 | LU | 25.02.2004 | BE | 28.02.2004 | MC | 28.02.2004 | CH | 29.02.2004 | LI | 29.02.2004 | DK | 21.04.2004 | GR | 21.04.2004 | SE | 21.04.2004 | PT | 21.06.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | CY | 21.01.2004 | |
ES | 21.01.2004 | ||
FI | 21.01.2004 | ||
FR | 21.01.2004 | ||
IE | 21.01.2004 | ||
IT | 21.01.2004 | ||
NL | 21.01.2004 | ||
LU | 25.02.2004 | ||
BE | 28.02.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
CH | 29.02.2004 | ||
LI | 29.02.2004 | ||
DK | 21.04.2004 | ||
GR | 21.04.2004 | ||
SE | 21.04.2004 | ||
Former [2007/08] | CY | 21.01.2004 | |
ES | 21.01.2004 | ||
FI | 21.01.2004 | ||
FR | 21.01.2004 | ||
IE | 21.01.2004 | ||
NL | 21.01.2004 | ||
LU | 25.02.2004 | ||
BE | 28.02.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
CH | 29.02.2004 | ||
LI | 29.02.2004 | ||
DK | 21.04.2004 | ||
GR | 21.04.2004 | ||
SE | 21.04.2004 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 21.01.2004 | |
FR | 21.01.2004 | ||
IE | 21.01.2004 | ||
NL | 21.01.2004 | ||
LU | 25.02.2004 | ||
BE | 28.02.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
CH | 29.02.2004 | ||
LI | 29.02.2004 | ||
DK | 21.04.2004 | ||
GR | 21.04.2004 | ||
SE | 21.04.2004 | ||
Former [2006/12] | FI | 21.01.2004 | |
IE | 21.01.2004 | ||
NL | 21.01.2004 | ||
LU | 25.02.2004 | ||
BE | 28.02.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
CH | 29.02.2004 | ||
LI | 29.02.2004 | ||
DK | 21.04.2004 | ||
GR | 21.04.2004 | ||
SE | 21.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | FI | 21.01.2004 | |
IE | 21.01.2004 | ||
LU | 25.02.2004 | ||
BE | 28.02.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
CH | 29.02.2004 | ||
LI | 29.02.2004 | ||
DK | 21.04.2004 | ||
GR | 21.04.2004 | ||
SE | 21.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | FI | 21.01.2004 | |
IE | 21.01.2004 | ||
BE | 28.02.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
CH | 29.02.2004 | ||
LI | 29.02.2004 | ||
DK | 21.04.2004 | ||
GR | 21.04.2004 | ||
SE | 21.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/03] | FI | 21.01.2004 | |
IE | 21.01.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
CH | 29.02.2004 | ||
LI | 29.02.2004 | ||
DK | 21.04.2004 | ||
GR | 21.04.2004 | ||
SE | 21.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 21.01.2004 | |
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
CH | 29.02.2004 | ||
LI | 29.02.2004 | ||
DK | 21.04.2004 | ||
GR | 21.04.2004 | ||
SE | 21.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | FI | 21.01.2004 | |
CH | 29.02.2004 | ||
LI | 29.02.2004 | ||
GR | 21.04.2004 | ||
SE | 21.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 21.01.2004 | |
GR | 21.04.2004 | ||
SE | 21.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 21.01.2004 | |
SE | 21.04.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | BRPI7508401 [ ]; | [A]JPS502396 ; | [XA]DE2055283 (FIBERGLAS CANADA LTD) [X] 1,4,6,7,9,14,20,41,42,54 * claim - * [A] 3,10; | JPS5044217 [ ] (EIDAI CO., LTD.); | JPS63242977 [ ] (OSAKA SODA CO LTD, et al); | [XA] - T.SAKAI, "Manufacture of foamed inorganic articles for building materials", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19890417), vol. 110, no. 16, Database accession no. 140414c, XP000058894 [X] 1,7,14,20,39-42,54 * abstract * [A] 3,6,9 | [A] - E.SATO, "Thermally insulating material", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19780109), vol. 88, no. 2, Database accession no. 11079a, XP000063197 [A] 1-3,11,12,14,15,20,26,30,31,41,54 * abstract * | [A] - Y.KATAYAMA, "Production of inorganic foams and its apparatus", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19760322), vol. 84, no. 12, Database accession no. 78849n, XP000063235 [A] 1-3,6,11,14,18,20,41,42,47,54 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1975, no. 34, Database accession no. 1975-56203W, XP002139280 & JPS502396 A 19750111 (SHIMIZU K) [A] 1,2,6,7,12,14,15,23,30,31,54 * abstract * |