EP1032099 - Semiconductor device and method of fabricating the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.09.2009 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2001/37] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka / JP | ||
Former [2000/35] | For all designated states Matsushita Electronics Corporation 1-1, Saiwai-cho Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569-1193 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishida, Masahiro 24-6, Ikaga-nishimachi Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0066 / JP | 02 /
Yuri, Masaaki 6-26-1201, Funaki-cho Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-0828 / JP | 03 /
Imafuji, Osamu 1-10-5-507, Kamihamuro-cho Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569-1044 / JP | 04 /
Nakamura, Shinji 1-3-507-403, Nasahara Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569-1041 / JP | 05 /
Orita, Kenji 1-44-9-C102, Tsunoe-cho Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569-0822 / JP | [2000/35] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/35] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00103996.5 | 25.02.2000 | [2000/35] | Priority number, date | JP19990050027 | 26.02.1999 Original published format: JP 5002799 | [2000/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1032099 | Date: | 30.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1032099 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | [2005/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/00, H01L21/20 | [2005/33] | CPC: |
H01L21/0237 (EP,US);
H01L21/02381 (EP,US);
H01L21/0242 (EP,US);
H01L21/0245 (EP,US);
H01L21/02458 (EP,US);
H01L21/02502 (EP,US);
H01L21/0254 (EP,US);
H01L33/007 (EP,US);
H01L33/0093 (EP,US);
H01S5/32341 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2000/35] | H01S5/323, H01L33/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/29] |
Former [2000/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Halbleitervorrichtung und Herstellungsverfahren | [2000/35] | English: | Semiconductor device and method of fabricating the same | [2000/35] | French: | Dispositif semi-conducteur et procédé de fabrication | [2000/35] | Examination procedure | 10.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/18] | 12.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/42] | 01.12.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2009 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH1140893 ; | US6242764 [ ] (OHBA YASUO [JP], et al); | [XY]EP0779666 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 6,13 * abstract * [Y] 7,8,14; | [Y]EP0291346 (SHARP KK [JP]) [Y] 3-5,7,8,11,12,14 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4211970 (TELEFUNKEN SYSTEMTECHNIK [DE]) [A] 1,6 * the whole document *; | [A]US4180825 (MASON DONALD R [US]) [A] 1,6 * the whole document * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990531), vol. 1999, no. 05, & JP11040893 A 19990212 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1,2,9,10 * the whole document * [Y] 3-5,11,12 |