EP1038514 - Cosmetic compositions for lipsticks, eyeliners or powders [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2006 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NELE Kosmetik GmbH Ziegeleistrasse 3 91338 Igensdorf / DE | [2005/48] |
Former [2000/39] | For all designated states NELE Kosmetik GmbH Ziegeleistrasse 3 91338 Igensdorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hempel, Matthias, Dr. Grossgeschaidt 243 90562 Heroldsberg / DE | [2000/39] | Representative(s) | Schneck, Herbert, et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/39] | Schneck, Herbert, Dipl.-Phys., Dr., et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 00104033.6 | 26.02.2000 | [2000/39] | Priority number, date | DE1999108653 | 27.02.1999 Original published format: DE 19908653 | [2000/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1038514 | Date: | 27.09.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1038514 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | [2000/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1038514 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/02, A45D40/26 | [2000/49] | CPC: |
A61K8/42 (EP);
A61K8/345 (EP);
A61Q1/06 (EP);
A61Q1/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/39] | A61K7/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/36] |
Former [2000/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kosmetische Masse für Lippenstift, Lidstift oder Puder | [2000/39] | English: | Cosmetic compositions for lipsticks, eyeliners or powders | [2000/39] | French: | Composition cosmétique pour rouge à lèvres, crayon à paupières ou poudre | [2000/39] | Examination procedure | 02.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/27] | 14.06.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 23.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.07.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   20.03.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/35] | IT | 30.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3957969 (FUJIYAMA YOSHIO, et al) [X] 1 * claims 1-14 *; | [X]US5192153 (GUERET JEAN-LOUIS H [FR]) [X] 6-8,10 * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 7; figures 1-10 *; | [XY]US5180241 (GUERET JEAN-LOUIS H [FR]) [X] 6-8 * figure 1; claim 1 * [Y] 7-10; | [Y]FR2330353 (DAHM KLAUS [DE]) [Y] 7-10 * page 3, line 8 - line 24; figure 1 * |