EP1130135 - Silicon carbide film and method for manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.06.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOYA CORPORATION 7-5, Naka-Ochiai 2-Chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 161-0032 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/32] | For all designated states HOYA CORPORATION 7-5, Naka-Ochiai 2-Chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2001/36] | For all designated states HOYA CORPORATION 7-5, Naka-Ochiai 2-Chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakano, Yukitaka, c/o Hoya Corporation 7-5 Naka-Ochiai 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Nagasawa, Hiroyuki, c/o Hoya Corporation 7-5 Naka-Ochiai 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Yagi, Kuniaki, c/o Hoya Corporation 7-5 Naka-Ochiai 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Kawahara, Takamitsu, c/o Hoya Corporation 7-5 Naka-Ochiai 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [2001/36] | Representative(s) | Schippan, Ralph Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/36] | Schippan, Ralph, Dr.-Ing. Cohausz & Florack, Kanzlerstrasse 8a 40472 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 00104123.5 | 29.02.2000 | [2001/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1130135 | Date: | 05.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1130135 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C30B25/02, C23C16/32 | [2001/36] | CPC: |
C23C16/325 (EP,US);
C30B25/02 (EP,US);
C30B25/18 (EP,US);
C30B29/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2002/21] |
Former [2001/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Siliziumkarbidschicht und Herstellungsverfahren | [2001/36] | English: | Silicon carbide film and method for manufacturing the same | [2001/36] | French: | Film de carbure de silicium et son procédé de fabrication | [2001/36] | Examination procedure | 03.08.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/40] | 26.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07109336.3 / EP1840249 | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS63270398 ; | [A]EP0020134 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]) [A] 1,2,4-6 * abstract *; | [A]US5501173 (BURK JR ALBERT A [US], et al) [A] 1,2,7,9 * abstract * * column 2, line 30 - line 64 * | [XA] - MITSUHIRO SHIGETA ET AL, "CHEMICAL VAPOR DEPOSITION OF SINGLE-CRYSTAL FILMS OF CUBIC SIC ON PATTERNED SI SUBSTRATES", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS,US,AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, (19891009), vol. 55, no. 15, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 1522 - 1524, XP000094807 [X] 1-4,8,9 * abstract * * page 1522, column R, line 9 - line 20 * [A] 5,6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.102252 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890227), vol. 013, no. 084, Database accession no. (C - 572), & JP63270398 A 19881108 (SHARP CORP) [X] 1,2,8,9 * abstract * | [DA] - K. SHIBAHARA, S. NISHINO AND H. MATSUNAMI, "Antiphase-domain-free growth of cubic SiC on Si(100)", APPLIED PHYSIC LETTERS, US, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, (19870629), vol. 50, no. 26, pages 1888 - 1890, XP000885091 [DA] 1,8,9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.97676 |