EP1033708 - Disk recording or playback device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.12.2005 [2005/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 5-5, Keihan-Hondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihan-Hondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka / JP | ||
Former [2000/36] | For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kojima, Kazuyuki 1-11-2, Kamiji, Higashinari-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | [2000/36] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/36] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00104278.7 | 01.03.2000 | [2000/36] | Priority number, date | JP19990056715 | 04.03.1999 Original published format: JP 5671599 | [2000/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1033708 | Date: | 06.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1033708 | Date: | 06.12.2000 | [2000/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1033708 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G11B17/04 | [2000/36] | CPC: |
G11B17/046 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2001/34] |
Former [2000/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Plattenaufzeichnungs- oder Wiedergabegerät | [2000/36] | English: | Disk recording or playback device | [2000/36] | French: | Dispositif d'enregistrement ou de reproduction de disque | [2000/36] | Examination procedure | 22.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/12] | 20.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0640970 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1,2 * column 27, line 45 - column 36, line 12; figures 13-27 *; | [A]EP0643392 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1,2 * column 38, line 25 - column 39, line 23; figures 13-27 *; | [A]EP0547944 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * figure -; claims 9-13 *; | [A]WO9703440 (SONY CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column A; figure - * |