EP1046447 - Rotary slide valve plate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIDIER-WERKE AG Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 1 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | [2000/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schuler, Andreas Idsteiner Str. 15 65232 Taunusstein / DE | 02 /
Begel, Nicolas 2 rue du Ne'ron 38120 Saint Egreve / FR | 03 /
Sherriff, Robert Leipziger Strasse 3 55218 Ingelheim / DE | 04 /
Wiesel, Martin, Dr. Bierstadter Strasse 28 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | [2000/43] | Representative(s) | Becker, Thomas, et al Patentanwälte Becker & Müller Turmstrasse 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/43] | Becker, Thomas, Dr., Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Becker & Müller, Turmstrasse 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 00104312.4 | 02.03.2000 | [2000/43] | Priority number, date | DE1999117851 | 21.04.1999 Original published format: DE 19917851 | [2000/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1046447 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1046447 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B22D41/28, B22D41/26 | [2000/43] | CPC: |
B22D41/26 (EP);
B22D41/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/43] | Title | German: | Drehschieberplatte | [2000/43] | English: | Rotary slide valve plate | [2000/43] | French: | Plaque pour obturateur rotatif | [2000/43] | Examination procedure | 09.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/02] | 18.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.02.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 20.02.2003 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 25.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 09.04.2003 | Appeal received No. T0713/03 | 20.06.2003 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.07.2004 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | 08.07.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.07.2004 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 17.08.2005 | IE | 17.08.2005 | IT | 17.08.2005 | DK | 17.11.2005 | GR | 17.11.2005 | PT | 17.01.2006 | AT | 02.03.2006 | CH | 31.03.2006 | LI | 31.03.2006 | LU | 31.03.2006 | MC | 31.03.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2007/46] | IE | 17.08.2005 | |
IT | 17.08.2005 | ||
DK | 17.11.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
PT | 17.01.2006 | ||
AT | 02.03.2006 | ||
CH | 31.03.2006 | ||
LI | 31.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | IE | 17.08.2005 | |
IT | 17.08.2005 | ||
DK | 17.11.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
PT | 17.01.2006 | ||
CH | 31.03.2006 | ||
LI | 31.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/08] | IE | 17.08.2005 | |
DK | 17.11.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
PT | 17.01.2006 | ||
CH | 31.03.2006 | ||
LI | 31.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/46] | IE | 17.08.2005 | |
DK | 17.11.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
PT | 17.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/26] | IE | 17.08.2005 | |
DK | 17.11.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
PT | 17.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | IE | 17.08.2005 | |
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
PT | 17.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/15] | GR | 17.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH07308756 ; | [X]DE3307193 (VGT AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,6,7 * figures 1-6; claim 1 *; | [Y]EP0529108 (SCHLADOVSKY LEOPOLD [DE]) [Y] 7 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [XY]DE4339316 (SCHLADOFSKY LEOPOLD DIPL ING F [DE]) [X] 1-4,6 * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 47; figures 1-4 * [Y] 7; | [A]EP0838291 (NIPPON KOKAN KK [JP], et al) [A] 1* figures 1-12; claims 1-4 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960329), vol. 1996, no. 03, & JP07308756 A 19951128 (TOKYO YOGYO CO LTD) [X] 1,4,6 * abstract * |