EP1130921 - Data transmission in non-reliable networks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2001/36] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Kadoma Osaka 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hakenberg, Rolf c/o Panasonic European Labor.Gmbh Monzastrasse 4c 63225 Langen / DE | 02 /
Burmeister, Carsten c/o Panasonic Europ. Lab. Gmbh Monzastrasse 4c 63225 Langen / DE | 03 /
Wiebke, Thomas c/o Panasonic Europ. Labor. Gmbh Monzastrasse 4c 63225 Langen / DE | [2001/36] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/36] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00104389.2 | 02.03.2000 | [2001/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1130921 | Date: | 05.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1130921 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/24 | [2001/36] | CPC: |
H04L47/2416 (EP,US);
H04L1/18 (EP,US);
H04L47/10 (EP,US);
H04L47/32 (EP,US);
H04L47/34 (EP,US);
H04L47/38 (EP,US);
H04N19/107 (EP,US);
H04N19/166 (EP,US);
H04N19/172 (EP,US);
H04N19/61 (EP,US);
H04N19/89 (EP,US);
H04N21/6377 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/21] |
Former [2001/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Datenübertragung über ein unzuverlässiges Netz | [2001/36] | English: | Data transmission in non-reliable networks | [2001/36] | French: | Transmission de données en environnement non fiable | [2001/36] | Examination procedure | 28.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/04] | 27.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04009117.5 / EP1447988 | Opposition(s) | 13.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5528284 (IWAMI NAOKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7,8 * the whole document * [Y] 3,6; | [A]US5784527 (ORT JEFFREY [US]) [A] 1,7 * abstract * * column 2, line 36 - line 65 * * column 8, line 46 - line 55 * * column 10, line 57 - column 11, line 14 ** figure 5 *; | [Y]US5974028 (RAMAKRISHNAN KADANGODE K [US]) [Y] 3,6 * column 1, line 16 - line 54 * * column 2, line 30 - line 44 * * column 4, line 22 - line 38 *; | [X] - FUKUNAGA S ET AL, "ERROR RESILIENT VIDEO CODING BY DYNAMIC REPLACING OF REFERENCE PICTURES", GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE (GLOBECOM),US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (19961118), ISBN 0-7803-3337-3, pages 1503 - 1508, XP000748704 [X] 1,4 * page 1504, paragraph B; figure 1 * * page 1505, paragraph B; figure 2 * |