EP1039147 - Means for controlled activation of a valve switching member, especially for a goods vehicle container switching valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, LU | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/39] | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE SYSTEME FÜR NUTZFAHRZEUGE GMBH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/39] | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vollmer, Otto Joergstrasse 50 80689 München / DE | [2000/39] | Application number, filing date | 00104436.1 | 03.03.2000 | [2000/39] | Priority number, date | DE1999113380 | 24.03.1999 Original published format: DE 19913380 | [2000/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1039147 | Date: | 27.09.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1039147 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | [2003/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1039147 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F15B15/26 | [2003/32] | CPC: |
F16K31/56 (EP);
B60G17/0525 (EP);
F16K31/06 (EP);
B60G2500/204 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/39] | F15B15/26, F15B13/04, F15B20/00, B60G17/056 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/39] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur gesteuerten Betätigung eines Schaltorgans eines Ventils, insbesondere eines Containerschaltventils eines Nutzfahrzeugs | [2000/39] | English: | Means for controlled activation of a valve switching member, especially for a goods vehicle container switching valve | [2000/39] | French: | Moyen pour l'actionnement commandé d'un membre de commutation d'un distributeur, surtout d'un distributeur de commutation pour conteneurs d'un camion | [2000/39] | Examination procedure | 06.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/15] | 12.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 27.09.2006 | FI | 27.09.2006 | IE | 27.09.2006 | NL | 27.09.2006 | DK | 27.12.2006 | SE | 27.12.2006 | GR | 28.12.2006 | ES | 07.01.2007 | LU | 03.03.2007 | PT | 13.03.2007 | BE | 31.03.2007 | CH | 31.03.2007 | LI | 31.03.2007 | MC | 31.03.2007 | [2009/37] |
Former [2008/19] | FI | 27.09.2006 | |
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
GR | 28.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
CH | 31.03.2007 | ||
LI | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | FI | 27.09.2006 | |
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
CH | 31.03.2007 | ||
LI | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | FI | 27.09.2006 | |
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | FI | 27.09.2006 | |
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | FI | 27.09.2006 | |
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
IT | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/35] | FI | 27.09.2006 | |
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
IT | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/26] | FI | 27.09.2006 | |
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 27.09.2006 | |
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/21] | FI | 27.09.2006 | |
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 27.09.2006 | |
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | FI | 27.09.2006 | |
SE | 27.12.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US393596 (WESTINGHOUSE GEORGE) [X] 1,4,7 * page 1, lines 22-27 * * page 1, lines 49-56 * * page 2, lines 11-90 * * figure 1; claim 4 * [Y] 2,3,5,6,8,9; | [X]US1720284 (MALIPHANT CHARLES W) [X] 1 * page 2, lines 6-99; figure 1 *; | [A]FR2327895 (KNORR BREMSE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1* page 5, lines 8-26; figure 2 *; | [AY]GB2098685 (REXROTH MANNESMANN GMBH) [A] 1 * page 2, lines 110-122 * * page 3, lines 6-62; figure 1 * [Y] 8,9; | [X]GB2159249 (BOUZAS FUENTETAJA JULIO) [X] 1 * page 1, line 126 - page 2, line 48; figure 1 *; | [AY]DE3900944 (FESTO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 5, lines 7-30; figures 1,2 * [Y] 2,3,5,6; | [X]US5074335 (BEUERMANN HERBERT [DE]) [X] 1 * column 3, lines 33-53; figures 1,5,6 *; | [X]US5176231 (MOODY JOHN W [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 3, line 42 - column 4, line 18; figure 1 * | by applicant | DE4120824 | EP0520148 |