EP1036869 - Method and device for weft yarn monitoring in weaving processes and the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.12.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.02.2005 [2005/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L.G.L. Electronics S.p.A. Via Ugo Foscolo, 156 24024 Gandino (Bergamo) / IT | [2000/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zenoni, Pietro Via Montegrappa 3 24026 Leffe (Prov. of Bergamo) / IT | 02 /
Gotti, Luca Via Palma il Vecchio 6 24021 Albino (Prov. of Bergamo) / IT | [2000/38] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Spandonari & Modiano S.r.l., Corso Duca degli Abruzzi, 16 10129 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/38] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Spandonari & Modiano S.r.l., Corso Duca degli Abruzzi, 16 10129 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 00104465.0 | 08.03.2000 | [2000/38] | Priority number, date | IT1999TO00204 | 16.03.1999 Original published format: IT TO990204 | [2000/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1036869 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1036869 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | D03D51/34 | [2000/38] | CPC: |
D03D51/34 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2001/23] |
Former [2000/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Überwachung von Schussfaden in Webverfahren oder dergleichen | [2000/38] | English: | Method and device for weft yarn monitoring in weaving processes and the like | [2000/38] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour surveiller la trame dans les procédés de tissage et similaires | [2000/38] | Examination procedure | 26.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/17] | 07.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0325793 (ROY ELECTROTEX SPA [IT]) [AD] 1,2,9,10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0570875 (PICANOL NV [BE]) |