EP1043548 - Mounting element for attaching wall heating modules [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.01.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.02.2006 [2006/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states fischerwerke Artur Fischer GmbH & Co. KG Weinhalde 14-18 72178 Waldachtal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/41] | For all designated states fischerwerke Artur Fischer GmbH & Co. KG Weinhalde 14-18 72178 Waldachtal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Herbstreit, Rolf Hohlgasse 21 72178 Waldachtal / DE | 02 /
Aschaff, Carsten Goethestrasse 17 91580 Petersaurach / DE | [2000/41] | Application number, filing date | 00104627.5 | 03.03.2000 | [2000/41] | Priority number, date | DE1999206280U | 08.04.1999 Original published format: DE 29906280 U | [2000/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1043548 | Date: | 11.10.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1043548 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | [2003/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F24D3/14 | [2000/41] | CPC: |
F24D3/141 (EP);
Y02B30/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/41] | Title | German: | Montageelement zur Befestigung von Wandheizungsmodulen | [2000/41] | English: | Mounting element for attaching wall heating modules | [2000/41] | French: | Element de montage pour agraffer des modules de chauffage par le mur | [2000/41] | Examination procedure | 13.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/28] | 18.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/08] | 23.09.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2910612 (NOKE WAERMEBAU GMBH & CO KG) [X] 1-3 * page 7, paragraph 4 - page 9, paragraph 1; figures 1,2 *; | [X]GB2174451 (EGA LTD) [X] 1,2 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0897089 (HEWING GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-3 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0685680 (HEWING GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2 * figures 4,5 * |