EP1110632 - Roller head for a planetary rolling mill [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Outokumpu Oyj Riihitontuntie 7 02200 Espoo / FI | [2001/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Knaapi, Heikki Purrantie 121 34710 Vaskivesi / FI | 02 /
Luotola, Harri Hakalantanhua 15 29100 Luvia / FI | [2001/26] | Representative(s) | Graf Glück Habersack Kritzenberger Patentanwälte Wotanstrasse 64 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Zipse Habersack Kritzenberger Patentanwälte Wotanstrasse 64 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/26] | Zipse & Habersack Wotanstrasse 64 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00104716.6 | 03.03.2000 | [2001/26] | Priority number, date | FI19990002740 | 21.12.1999 Original published format: FI 992740 | [2001/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1110632 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1110632 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | [2003/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1110632 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B21B13/00, B21B31/18 | [2001/26] | CPC: |
B21B31/18 (EP,KR,US);
B21B13/008 (EP,US);
B21B2271/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/26] | Title | German: | Walzkopf für ein Planetenwalzwerk | [2001/26] | English: | Roller head for a planetary rolling mill | [2001/26] | French: | Tête de cylindre pour un laminoir planétaire | [2001/26] | Examination procedure | 27.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/05] | 28.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.05.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 04.08.2004 | DK | 04.11.2004 | PT | 04.01.2005 | CY | 03.03.2005 | IE | 03.03.2005 | LU | 03.03.2005 | MC | 31.03.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/20] | FI | 04.08.2004 | |
DK | 04.11.2004 | ||
CY | 03.03.2005 | ||
IE | 03.03.2005 | ||
LU | 03.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | FI | 04.08.2004 | |
DK | 04.11.2004 | ||
IE | 03.03.2005 | ||
LU | 03.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 04.08.2004 | |
DK | 04.11.2004 | ||
IE | 03.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 04.08.2004 | |
DK | 04.11.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/22] | FI | 04.08.2004 | |
DK | 04.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 04.08.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS60240312 ; | [A]JPS58157508 ; | [DA]US3718020 (LEITNER H) [DA] 1-3,5,6,8 * column 2, line 64 - column 5, line 7; figure 1 *; | [A]DE2748770 (SCHLOEMANN SIEMAG AG [DE]) [A] 1-3,5,6,8 * page 6 - page 10; figure 2 *; | [A]DE3125682 (SCHLOEMANN SIEMAG AG [DE]) [A] 1-3,6,8 * page 8 - page 14; figures 1,1A,3 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860423), vol. 010, no. 109, Database accession no. (M - 472), & JP60240312 A 19851129 (KAWASAKI JUKOGYO KK) [A] 1,6,8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19831213), vol. 007, no. 279, Database accession no. (M - 262), & JP58157508 A 19830919 (KAWASAKI JUKOGYO KK) [A] 1,6,8 * abstract * |