EP1034912 - Thermoplastic resin injection molding machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.2003 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.11.2003 [2003/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/37] | For all designated states Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seta, Kunihito, c/o (A170) Intel.Prop.Dept. Murata Manuf. Co.,Ltd, 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | 02 /
Takeda, Takeshi, c/o (A170) Intel.Prop.Dept. Murata Manuf. Co.,Ltd, 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | [2000/37] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/37] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing. Schoppe, Zimmermann & Stöckeler Patentanwälte Postfach 71 08 67 81458 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00104831.3 | 07.03.2000 | [2000/37] | Priority number, date | JP19990064326 | 11.03.1999 Original published format: JP 6432699 | [2000/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1034912 | Date: | 13.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1034912 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/46, B29C45/76 | [2000/37] | CPC: |
B29C45/46 (EP,US);
B29C45/7613 (EP,US);
B29C2045/465 (EP,US);
B29C2945/76006 (EP,US);
B29C2945/76257 (EP,US);
B29C2945/76381 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE [2001/22] |
Former [2000/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Spritzgiessmaschine für thermoplastisches Harz | [2000/37] | English: | Thermoplastic resin injection molding machine | [2000/37] | French: | Machine de moulage par injection d'une résine thermoplastique | [2000/37] | Examination procedure | 07.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/37] | 05.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS62207622 ; | [A]JPH01320126 ; | [XY]DE4331209 (HENNIGES ELASTOMER KUNSTSTOFF [DE]) [X] 1,4,7,9 * column 5, line 58 - column 6, line 54 * * column 5, line 2 - line 5 * * column 4, line 53 * * column 6, line 20 * * claims 1,9 * [Y] 2; | [Y]US5447425 (HSU YAO-TUNG [TW], et al) [Y] 2 * column 5, line 1 - line 25 *; | [X]DE4414246 (BATTENFELD GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,4,6 * column 2, line 62 - line 68 *; | [X]US5863485 (GROLEAU RODNEY J [US]) [X] 1,8 * column 1, line 47 - line 49 * * column 3, line 31 - line 45 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880224), vol. 012, no. 061, Database accession no. (M - 671), & JP62207622 A 19870912 (JAPAN STEEL WORKS LTD:THE) [Y] 2 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900309), vol. 014, no. 127, Database accession no. (M - 0947), & JP01320126 A 19891226 (NOK CORP) [A] 3 * abstract * |