EP1034824 - Shell-and-tube heat exchanger and method for inhibiting polymerization in the shell-and-tube heat exchanger [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON SHOKUBAI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Koraibashi, 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 541-0043 / JP | [2007/10] |
Former [2000/37] | For all designated states NIPPON SHOKUBAI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Koraibashi, 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 541-0043 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nishimura, Takeshi 169-9 Kamigawara, Yobe-ku Himeji-shi, Hyogo / JP | 02 /
Matsumoto, Yukihiro 1-45 Goshikiyama 1-chome, Tarumi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo / JP | [2000/37] | Representative(s) | Mai, Oppermann & Partner i.L. Patentanwälte John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/37] | Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner GbR Patentanwälte, John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 00104889.1 | 08.03.2000 | [2000/37] | Priority number, date | JP19990065403 | 11.03.1999 Original published format: JP 6540399 | JP19990070503 | 16.03.1999 Original published format: JP 7050399 | [2000/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1034824 | Date: | 13.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1034824 | Date: | 14.02.2001 | [2001/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1034824 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B01D3/32, B01D5/00, F28D7/16 | [2001/07] | CPC: |
B01D3/322 (EP,US);
B01D5/0012 (EP,US);
C25F3/24 (EP,US);
F28D7/16 (EP,US);
F28F19/00 (EP,US);
F28F9/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/37] | B01D3/32 | Designated contracting states | BE [2001/44] |
Former [2000/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Röhrenwärmeaustauscher sowie Verfahren zur Inhibierung der Polymerisierung im Röhrenwärmeaustauscher | [2000/37] | English: | Shell-and-tube heat exchanger and method for inhibiting polymerization in the shell-and-tube heat exchanger | [2000/37] | French: | Echangeur de chaleur tubulaire et procédé d inhibition de la polymérisation dans l' échangeur de chaleur tubulaire | [2006/20] |
Former [2000/37] | Echangeur de chaleur tubulaire et procédé d inhibition de la polymérisation dans l échangeur de chaleur tubulaire | Examination procedure | 20.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/25] | 15.08.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 08.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.09.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2001 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0854129 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,9-11,13-17 * column 2, line 42 - line 44; figure -; example -; claim - *; | [X]EP0589230 (KELLOGG M W CO [US]) [X] 1,2,4,8,9 * figure .; claim - *; | [X]GB1265738 (THE GOODYEAR TIRE) [X] 1 * figure . *; | [A]EP0569644 (HITACHI SHIPBUILDING ENG CO [JP]) [A] 7,12 * claim 1 *; | [A]US5772850 (MORRIS BOBBY D [US]) [A] 5 * column 4, line 62 - column 67; figure - * |