EP1037076 - Lightguide contact connector for connector assemblies [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.03.2005 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.04.2005 [2005/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reichle & De-Massari AG Binzstrasse 31 8620 Wetzikon / CH | [2000/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reichle, Hans Guldislooweg 16 8620 Wetzikon / CH | [2000/38] | Representative(s) | Petschner, Goetz Patentanwaltsbüro Petschner & Partner Rothusmatt 5 6300 Zug / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/38] | Petschner, Goetz Patentanwaltsbüro G. Petschner Wannenstrasse 16 8800 Thalwil / CH | Application number, filing date | 00104978.2 | 09.03.2000 | [2000/38] | Priority number, date | CH19990000497 | 17.03.1999 Original published format: CH 49799 | [2000/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1037076 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/38 | [2000/38] | CPC: |
G02B6/3893 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/38] | Title | German: | Kontaktstecker für Lichtwellenleiter zu Steckverbinder-Anordnungen | [2000/38] | English: | Lightguide contact connector for connector assemblies | [2000/38] | French: | Connecteur à contact de guides d'ondes optique pour ensemble de connecteur | [2000/38] | Examination procedure | 20.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/21] | 08.03.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0848267 (MOLEX INC [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * column 7, line 1 - line 31 * * figures 23-26 *; | [X]GB2043935 (BUNKER RAMO) [X] 1,5 * page 1, line 70 - line 114 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0685750 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS [JP]) [A] 1,4,5 * column 5, line 31 - line 48 *; | [A]US4762389 (KAIHARA SHIGERU [JP]) [A] 1,2,5 * figures 4-9 * * column 3, line 45 - line 66 *; | [A]US4233724 (BOWEN TERRY P, et al) [A] 1,2 * figure 7; example 10 * * column 3, line 62 - line 68 * * column 4, line 1 - line 21 * |