EP1022737 - Optical disk, optical disk device, and method of reproducing information on optical disk [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2009 | Change - representative | published on 20.01.2010 [2010/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2000/30] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishida, Takashi 13-14, Hashimoto-isoku Yawata-shi, Kyoto 614 / JP | 02 /
Gushima, Toyoji 3-5-10, Takawashi Habikino-shi, Osaka 583 / JP | [2000/30] | Representative(s) | Balsters, Robert, et al Novagraaf International S.A. Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | Balsters, Robert, et al Novagraaf International S.A. Avenue du Pailly 25 1220 Les Avanchets-Genève / CH | ||
Former [2000/30] | Balsters, Robert, et al Novapat International SA, 9, rue du Valais 1202 Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 00105675.3 | 07.02.1997 | [2000/30] | Priority number, date | JP19960022273 | 08.02.1996 Original published format: JP 2227396 | [2000/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1022737 | Date: | 26.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1022737 | Date: | 30.08.2000 | [2000/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1022737 | Date: | 14.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/00, G11B7/007, G11B20/12, G11B20/14 | [2000/36] | CPC: |
G11B20/1217 (EP,KR,US);
G11B7/00745 (EP,KR,US);
G11B20/1252 (EP,US);
G11B20/1426 (EP,US);
G11B20/1833 (KR);
G11B27/19 (EP,US);
G11B27/24 (EP,US);
G11B27/3027 (EP,US);
G11B7/00718 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1232 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1267 (EP,KR,US);
G11B2020/1274 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1287 (EP,US);
G11B2220/20 (EP,US);
G11B2220/216 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/30] | G11B20/12, G11B20/14, G11B7/007, G11B7/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/20] |
Former [2000/30] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Optische Platte, optische Plattenvorrichtung und Verfahren zur Wiedergabe von Informationen auf der optischen Platte | [2000/30] | English: | Optical disk, optical disk device, and method of reproducing information on optical disk | [2000/30] | French: | Disque optique, dispositif pour disque optique et procédé pour reproduire des informations sur une disque optique | [2000/30] | Examination procedure | 17.03.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 05.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/30] | 30.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 28.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97902635.8 / EP0880129 | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP0801382 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1 * column 15, line 30 - column 16, line 5 * * column 22, line 43 - column 25, line 27 * * figures 3,7 *; | [A]DE4411872 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 41 - column 2, line 9 * * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 40 * * figures 1B,5 *; | [A]EP0673029 (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 1, line 13 - line 42 * * column 2, line 54 - column 4, line 26 * * column 5, line 15 - column 8, line 7 * * figures 1,3-5,8 *; | [A]US5359584 (FUKUSHIMA YOSHIHISA [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 3, line 63 - column 4, line 46 * * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0517483 (QUANTUM CORP [US]) [A] 1 * column 8, line 29 - column 9, line 45 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0461912 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 51 - column 5, line 14 * * figures 5-7 *; | [A]US5233592 (SUZUKI HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0673027 (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 4, line 41 - column 5, line 13 * * column 6, line 54 - column 8, line 11 * * figure 1 *; | [A]JPH0793904 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950831), vol. 1995, no. 07, & JP07093904 A 19950407 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |