EP1040766 - Iron-enriched beverage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2005 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Snow Brand Milk Products Co., Ltd. 1-1 Naebocho 6-chome Higashi-ku Sapporo-shi Hokkaido 065-0043 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/40] | For all designated states SNOW BRAND MILK PRODUCTS, CO., LTD. 1-1 Naebocho 6-chome Higashi-ku Sapporo-shi Hokkaido 065-0043 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Abe, Takumi 846-11, Obukuroshinden Kawagoe-shi, Saitama 350-1167 / JP | 02 /
Suguri, Toshiaki 7-14-7, Nishioku, Arakawa-ku Tokyo 116-0011 / JP | 03 /
Sato, Kaoru 309, 1-1-7, Shinden Kamifukuoka-shi, Saitama 356-0033 / JP | 04 /
Onishi, Yoshinori 2-21, 2-18-1, Gion, Minamikawachi-machi Kawachi-gun, Tochigi 329-0434 / JP | [2000/40] | Representative(s) | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al Boeters & Lieck Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/40] | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, Dr. rer. nat., Dipl.-Chem., et al Boeters & Bauer, Bereiteranger 15 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00106085.4 | 30.03.2000 | [2000/40] | Priority number, date | JP19990089741 | 30.03.1999 Original published format: JP 8974199 | [2000/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1040766 | Date: | 04.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1040766 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/304, A23L1/305, A23L2/52 | [2000/40] | CPC: |
A23L2/52 (EP);
A23L33/165 (EP);
A23L33/19 (EP);
A23V2002/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/54248 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/40] | Title | German: | Mit Eisen angereicherte Getränke | [2004/22] | English: | Iron-enriched beverage | [2000/40] | French: | Boisson enrichie en fer | [2000/40] |
Former [2000/40] | Mit Eisen angereichterte Getränke | Examination procedure | 28.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/04] | 18.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 26.05.2004 | IT | 26.05.2004 | GR | 26.08.2004 | SE | 26.08.2004 | ES | 06.09.2004 | PT | 26.10.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | FI | 26.05.2004 | |
IT | 26.05.2004 | ||
GR | 26.08.2004 | ||
SE | 26.08.2004 | ||
ES | 06.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | FI | 26.05.2004 | |
GR | 26.08.2004 | ||
SE | 26.08.2004 | ||
ES | 06.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 26.05.2004 | |
SE | 26.08.2004 | ||
ES | 06.09.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | SE | 26.08.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH07304798 ; | [A]EP0409252 (SNOW BRAND MILK PRODUCTS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-4 * example 1 *; | [A]EP0454084 (SNOW BRAND MILK PRODUCTS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-4 * examples 1,2 *; | [D]JPH06239900 (SNOW BRAND MILK PRODUCTS CO LTD); | [X]EP0656366 (SNOW BRAND MILK PRODUCTS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4 * page 19, line 56 - line 58; example 2; claims 1,11 * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960329), vol. 1996, no. 03, & JP07304798 A 19951121 (SNOW BRAND MILK PROD CO LTD) [DA] 1 * abstract * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 1996-035891 [ ] * abstract * |