EP1096567 - BGA package and method for fabricating the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.01.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.02.2011 [2011/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oki Electric Industry Co., Ltd. 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states Oki Electric Industry Co., Ltd. 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Terui, Makoto, c/o Oki Electric Industry Co., Ltd. 7-12, Toranomon, 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2001/18] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 02 51 80076 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | Betten & Resch Reichenbachstrasse 19 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00106301.5 | 22.03.2000 | [2001/18] | Priority number, date | JP19990302497 | 25.10.1999 Original published format: JP 30249799 | [2001/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1096567 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1096567 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | [2003/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01L25/065, H01L23/13, H01L21/56, H01L23/498, H05K3/44 | [2003/37] | CPC: |
H01L24/32 (EP,US);
H01L23/13 (EP,US);
H01L23/24 (EP,US);
H01L23/36 (EP,US);
H01L23/49816 (EP,US);
H01L24/29 (EP,US);
H01L25/0652 (EP,US);
H01L25/0657 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05599 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16225 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16237 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32225 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48227 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73204 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73265 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83101 (EP,US);
H01L2224/8547 (EP,US);
H01L2224/92125 (EP,US);
H01L2225/0651 (EP,US);
H01L2225/06517 (EP,US);
H01L2225/06541 (EP,US);
H01L2225/06582 (EP,US);
H01L2225/06586 (EP,US);
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
H01L24/73 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01004 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01005 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01006 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01029 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01033 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01078 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01079 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15151 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15153 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15165 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1517 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15173 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15311 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1532 (EP,US);
H01L2924/181 (EP,US);
H01L2924/351 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/05599, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/73204, H01L2224/16225, H01L2224/32225, H01L2924/00012 (US,EP);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32225, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00012 (US,EP);
H01L2224/8547, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/92125, H01L2224/73204, H01L2224/16225, H01L2224/32225, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45015, H01L2924/207 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45099 (US,EP);
H01L2924/15311, H01L2224/73204, H01L2224/16225, H01L2224/32225, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15311, H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32225, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2001/18] | H01L25/065, H01L23/13 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2004/23] |
Former [2001/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | KMG und seine Herstellung | [2001/18] | English: | BGA package and method for fabricating the same | [2001/18] | French: | RGB et methode de fabrication associée | [2001/18] | Examination procedure | 18.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/16] | 09.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/06] | 22.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4987100 (MCBRIDE DONALD G [US], et al) [A] 1,7,8,16 * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]DE3935680 (STANDARD ELEKTRIK LORENZ AG [DE]) [Y] 7 * column 2, line 1 - line 45; figure 1 *; | [XY]US5239198 (LIN PAUL T [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8-13,15 * figures 2,4 * * column 3, line 31 - column 5, line 11; figures 2,4 * [Y] 7,14,16; | [A]US5502893 (ENDOH SHUHICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,7,8,16* figure 1 *; | [Y]WO9900834 (IBM [US], et al) [Y] 16 * figure 2 *; | [Y]EP0933809 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [Y] 14 * figure 3 * | Examination | US5280192 | WO9736325 | US5936305 |