EP1039621 - Photovoltaic power generation device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2005 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.12.2005 [2005/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 5-5, Keihan-Hondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/39] | For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 5-5, Keihan-Hondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takeo, Ishida, c/o Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Ryuzo, Hagihara, c/o Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka / JP | 03 /
Hitoshi, Kishi, c/o Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka / JP | [2000/39] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/39] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00106432.8 | 24.03.2000 | [2000/39] | Priority number, date | JP19990079931 | 24.03.1999 Original published format: JP 7993199 | [2000/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1039621 | Date: | 27.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1039621 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | [2003/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1039621 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H02M7/48, H02J3/38, H02J7/35 | [2003/20] | CPC: |
H02J3/381 (EP,US);
H02J2300/24 (EP,US);
Y02E10/56 (EP,US);
Y10S136/291 (EP,US);
Y10S323/906 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/39] | H02M7/48, H02J3/38 | Designated contracting states | DE, IT, NL [2004/07] |
Former [2000/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Photovoltaische Leistungserzeugungsvorrichtung | [2000/39] | English: | Photovoltaic power generation device | [2000/39] | French: | Dispositif de génération d'énérgie photovoltaique | [2000/39] | Examination procedure | 24.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/26] | 17.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]JPH03203529 ; | [Y]JPH0898549 ; | [Y]JPH10207559 ; | [Y]JPH09121455 ; | [Y]JPH07250438 ; | [YA]JPH0420925 ; | [Y]JPS61269618 (FUJITSU LTD) [Y] 1 * figures 1,2,4 *; | [Y]JPS61280721 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [Y] 1 * figure 1 *; | [YA]US5644219 (KUROKAWA HIROYUKI [JP]) [Y] 2 * abstract * * figure 1 * [A] 4-10; | [Y]US5714869 (TAMECHIKA MASANARI [JP], et al) [Y] 1 * figures 1-3 * | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911128), vol. 015, no. 470, Database accession no. (E - 1139), & JP03203529 A 19910905 (KYOCERA CORP) [Y] 1-3 * abstract * [A] 4-10 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960830), vol. 1996, no. 08, & JP08098549 A 19960412 (SHARP CORP) [Y] 1 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981130), vol. 1998, no. 13, & JP10207559 A 19980807 (SHARP CORP) [Y] 1 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970930), vol. 1997, no. 09, & JP09121455 A 19970506 (CANON INC) [Y] 1 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960131), vol. 1996, no. 01, & JP07250438 A 19950926 (CANON INC) [Y] 1 * abstract * | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920428), vol. 016, no. 179, Database accession no. (P - 1345), & JP04020925 A 19920124 (SHARP CORP) [Y] 3 * abstract * [A] 4-10 |