EP1139208 - Disk module of solid state [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.03.2010 [2010/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POWER QUOTIENT INTERNATIONAL CO., LTD. 14F, No. 16, Jian-Ba Road Chung Ho City Taipei Hsien / TW | [N/P] |
Former [2001/40] | For all designated states POWER QUOTIENTINTERNATIONAL CO., LTD. 14F, No. 16, Jian-Ba Road Chung Ho City, Taipei Hsien, Taiwan / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yen, Sheng Shun 2F, No. 8, Lane 151, Fu-De Street Taipei / TW | [2001/40] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/41] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/40] | Helms, Joachim, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Dantestrasse 27 80637 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00106648.9 | 29.03.2000 | [2001/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1139208 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/06 | [2001/40] | CPC: |
G06F3/0626 (EP);
G06F3/0661 (EP);
G06F3/0679 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2002/26] |
Former [2001/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Festkörper-Plattenspeicherungsmodul | [2001/40] | English: | Disk module of solid state | [2001/40] | French: | Module de stockage de disques à semi-conducteurs | [2001/40] | Examination procedure | 01.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/24] | 05.04.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.08.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 28.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/09] | 14.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/09] | Request for further processing for: | 16.08.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 16.08.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.09.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.06.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5663901 (WALLACE ROBERT F [US], et al) [X] 1,6,7,9 * column 6, line 29 - line 65 * * column 7, line 46 - column 8, line 65; figures 9,12,13 *; | [X] - AT1810 Mini Mighty 1.8" IDE Solid State Flash Drive User Guide, SUNNYVALE, CA, USA, MEMTECH, (20000223), XP002150576 [X] 1-3,5-8,10,11 * page 3, line 1 - page 9, line L; figure - * | [X] - AT3510 Mega Mighty 3.5" IDE Solid State Flash Drive User Guide, SUNNYVALE, CA, USA, MEMTECH TECHNOLOGY, (19990803), XP002150577 [X] 1,3,5-7,9 * page 3, line 1 - page 5, line L; figures 1,2 * | [T] - Macronix Solid State Disk controller MX9691L Data Sheet, XP002150578 [T] 1,3,4 * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line L * |