EP1041601 - Fluorescent lamp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.09.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2000/40] | For all designated states Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimizu, Masanori 80-7, Yuden, Tanabe Kyotanabeshi, Kyoto 610-0311 / JP | 02 /
Ohkubo, Kazuaki 15-1-208, Miyatacho 3-chome Takatsukishi, Osaka 569-1142 / JP | 03 /
Arakawa, Takeshi 67, Koyamakamiitakuracho, Kitaku Kyotoshi, Kyoto 603-8126 / JP | 04 /
Tanabe, Yoshinori 2-3-1-1004, Nagaotanimachi Hirakatashi, Osaka 573-0164 / JP | 05 /
Hashimoto, Kenjiro 3-14-17, Taishibashi, Asahiku Osakashi, Osaka 535-0001 / JP | 06 /
Shimomura, Yoko 950-1-610, Tawaraguchicho Ikomashi, Nara 630-0243 / JP | [2000/40] | Representative(s) | Kügele, Bernhard, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/40] | Kügele, Bernhard, et al NOVAPAT INTERNATIONAL SA, 9, Rue du Valais 1202 Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 00106799.0 | 30.03.2000 | [2000/40] | Priority number, date | JP19990088712 | 30.03.1999 Original published format: JP 8871299 | [2000/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1041601 | Date: | 04.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01J61/10, H01J61/72 | [2000/40] | CPC: |
H01J61/10 (EP,US);
H01J61/103 (EP,US);
H01J61/72 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/25] |
Former [2000/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Leuchtstofflampe | [2000/40] | English: | Fluorescent lamp | [2000/40] | French: | Lampe fluorescente | [2000/40] | Examination procedure | 30.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/44] | 18.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/44] | 01.06.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2005/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DXA]JPS628440 ; | [A]US5818164 (WINSOR MARK D [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 31; figures 1,10 *; | [A]JPS55157852 ; | [A]JPS54142878 | [DXA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870604), vol. 011, no. 174, Database accession no. (E - 513), & JP62008440 A 19870116 (NOBORU KATSUMATA) [DX] 1-3,6 * abstract * [A] 9,11 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810224), vol. 005, no. 030, Database accession no. (E - 047), & JP55157852 A 19801208 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [A] 10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19800118), vol. 004, no. 006, Database accession no. (M - 088), & JP54142878 A 19791107 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |