EP1138876 - Internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OTICE Establishment Austrasse 42, Postfach 239 FL-9490 Vaduz / LI | [2001/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vorobyov, Yuri Valentinovich Nikiforovskaya ul.,d. 38, kl kv.209, Tambov / RU | [2004/41] |
Former [2001/40] | 01 /
Valentinovich Vorobyov, Yury Privokzalnaya ploschad, d. 14a kv.23, Tambov / RU | Representative(s) | Blum, Rudolf Emil E. BLUM & Co. AG Patent- und Markenanwälte VSP Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2001/40] | Blum, Rudolf Emil Ernst c/o E. Blum & Co Patentanwälte Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 00106891.5 | 31.03.2000 | [2001/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1138876 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1138876 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F01C1/32, F01C1/328 | [2001/40] | CPC: |
F01C1/336 (EP,US);
F02B53/00 (EP,KR,US);
F01C1/328 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/40] | Extension states | AL | 13.02.2002 | LT | 13.02.2002 | LV | 13.02.2002 | MK | 13.02.2002 | RO | 13.02.2002 | SI | 13.02.2002 | Title | German: | Brennkraftmaschine | [2001/40] | English: | Internal combustion engine | [2001/40] | French: | Moteur à combustion interne | [2001/40] | Examination procedure | 13.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/17] | 09.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.12.2004 | BE | 22.12.2004 | FI | 22.12.2004 | NL | 22.12.2004 | DK | 22.03.2005 | GR | 22.03.2005 | CY | 31.03.2005 | IE | 31.03.2005 | LU | 31.03.2005 | MC | 31.03.2005 | PT | 22.05.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/20] | AT | 22.12.2004 | |
BE | 22.12.2004 | ||
FI | 22.12.2004 | ||
NL | 22.12.2004 | ||
DK | 22.03.2005 | ||
GR | 22.03.2005 | ||
CY | 31.03.2005 | ||
IE | 31.03.2005 | ||
LU | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 22.12.2004 | |
BE | 22.12.2004 | ||
FI | 22.12.2004 | ||
NL | 22.12.2004 | ||
DK | 22.03.2005 | ||
GR | 22.03.2005 | ||
IE | 31.03.2005 | ||
LU | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/23] | AT | 22.12.2004 | |
BE | 22.12.2004 | ||
FI | 22.12.2004 | ||
NL | 22.12.2004 | ||
DK | 22.03.2005 | ||
GR | 22.03.2005 | ||
IE | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 22.12.2004 | |
BE | 22.12.2004 | ||
FI | 22.12.2004 | ||
NL | 22.12.2004 | ||
DK | 22.03.2005 | ||
GR | 22.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 22.12.2004 | |
BE | 22.12.2004 | ||
FI | 22.12.2004 | ||
DK | 22.03.2005 | ||
GR | 22.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 22.12.2004 | |
BE | 22.12.2004 | ||
FI | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 22.12.2004 | |
FI | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 22.12.2004 | |
GR | 22.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 22.12.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [DXA]US3703344 (REITTER TEODORO) [DX] 1,3,4 * figure 1 * * column A * * column 2, line 27 - line 68 * * column 3, line 1 - line 68 * * column 4, line 1 - line 36 * [A] 5-12; | [XA]DE2825071 (SCHMID WILHELM) [X] 1 * figure 1 * * abstract * * claims 1-5 * [A] 2; | [X]EP0601218 (CARIC ANDRO [DE]) [X] 1,3,4 * figure 1 * * abstract * * claims 1-14 *; | [A]WO9901666 (MALLEN BRIAN D [US]) [A] 1,2 * figure 1 * * abstract ** page 19, line 4 - line 13 * | by applicant | FR1366410 | US3703344 | FR2180346 | US3787150 |