EP1041558 - Optical disk controller and optical disk device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2007 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2006/33] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2000/40] | For all designated states Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sumi, Fumio 5-8-404, Myokenzaka Katano-shi, Osaka 576-0021 / JP | 02 /
Iwamura, Yoshiyuki 1-39-18, Kitayama Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0171 / JP | 03 /
Manabe, Noriyuki 56-1-105, Nishimachi Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569-0854 / JP | 04 /
Sakamoto, Hiroshi 3-23-A201, Higashitoyonaka-cho Toyonaka-shi, Osaka 560-0003 / JP | [2000/40] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/40] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00106938.4 | 31.03.2000 | [2000/40] | Priority number, date | JP19990092566 | 31.03.1999 Original published format: JP 9256699 | [2000/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1041558 | Date: | 04.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1041558 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | [2004/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1041558 | Date: | 16.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/18, G11B27/36, G11B19/28, G11B19/02, G11B19/04 | [2004/10] | CPC: |
G11B19/041 (KR);
G11B19/12 (KR);
G11B20/10 (EP,US);
G11B27/3027 (KR);
G11B27/34 (KR);
G11B27/36 (EP,US);
G11B7/00745 (KR);
G11B7/0943 (KR);
G11B2220/213 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/40] | G11B20/18, G11B27/36 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/52] |
Former [2000/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Optische Plattensteuerung und optisches Plattengerät | [2000/40] | English: | Optical disk controller and optical disk device | [2000/40] | French: | Contrôleur de disque optique et dispositif à disque optique | [2000/40] | Examination procedure | 16.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/34] | 27.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0241081 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 1,2 * figure 1 * * page 4, lines 1-6 * * page 5, lines 27-34 * * page 5, line 55 - page 6, line 6 * * page 8, line 51 - page 9, line 57 *; | [X]US5521893 (YAMASAKI YOSHIMORI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * figure 1 * * column 3, line 1 - column 5, line 54 *; | [YA]EP0469553 (NEC CORP [JP]) [Y] 1,2 * the whole document * [A] 3; | [Y]US5539590 (TATEISHI HISAO [JP]) [Y] 1,2 * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 19 * * column 5, lines 7-11 * * column 5, lines 28-32 * * column 11, lines 7-45 *; | [A] - ANONYMOUS, "Input/Output Operation Asynchronous STATUS Reporting Technique", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, New York, US, (19870101), vol. 29, no. 8, pages 3573 - 3576, XP002266124 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * |