EP1040886 - Method and system for automatic electrical sintering [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.12.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SPS Syntex Inc. 2-1, Sakado 3 chome Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP | [2007/07] |
Former [2005/51] | For all designated states SPS Syntex Inc. 2-1, Sakado 3 chome Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP | ||
Former [2005/43] | For all designated states SPS Processing Inc. 2-1, Sakado 3-chome Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP | ||
Former [2000/40] | For all designated states Sumitomo Coal Mining Co., Ltd. 20-4, Nishi Shinbashi 3-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tokita, Masao, c/o Sumitomo Coal Mining Co., Ltd. 20-4, Nishi Shinbashi 3-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2000/40] | Representative(s) | Sties, Jochen Prinz & Partner GbR Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/40] | Sties, Jochen, Dipl.-Ing. Prinz & Partner Patentanwälte Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00107023.4 | 31.03.2000 | [2000/40] | Priority number, date | JP19990093345 | 31.03.1999 Original published format: JP 9334599 | JP20000065369 | 09.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000065369 | [2000/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1040886 | Date: | 04.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1040886 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | [2004/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1040886 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B22F3/105, B22F7/06 | [2000/40] | CPC: |
F27D3/00 (EP,US);
B22F3/003 (EP,US);
B22F3/105 (EP,US);
B22F7/06 (EP,US);
B28B13/022 (EP,US);
B28B5/04 (EP,US);
B30B15/302 (EP,US);
B30B15/306 (EP,US);
C04B35/64 (EP,US);
B22F2999/00 (EP,US);
F27B21/00 (EP,US);
F27B9/2407 (EP,US);
F27D2099/0096 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B22F2999/00, B22F3/004, B22F2207/01, B22F7/06 (US,EP);
B22F2999/00, B22F3/14, B22F3/105 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/40] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum automatischen elektrischen Sintern | [2000/40] | English: | Method and system for automatic electrical sintering | [2000/40] | French: | Procédé et installation de frittage électrique automatique | [2000/40] | Examination procedure | 22.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/16] | 17.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 18.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.02.2007 | CH | 14.02.2007 | CY | 14.02.2007 | DK | 14.02.2007 | FI | 14.02.2007 | LI | 14.02.2007 | NL | 14.02.2007 | LU | 31.03.2007 | MC | 31.03.2007 | IE | 02.04.2007 | SE | 14.05.2007 | GR | 15.05.2007 | ES | 25.05.2007 | PT | 16.07.2007 | [2009/37] |
Former [2009/33] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
CH | 14.02.2007 | ||
CY | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
IE | 02.04.2007 | ||
SE | 14.05.2007 | ||
GR | 15.05.2007 | ||
ES | 25.05.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
CH | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
IE | 02.04.2007 | ||
SE | 14.05.2007 | ||
GR | 15.05.2007 | ||
ES | 25.05.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
CH | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.05.2007 | ||
GR | 15.05.2007 | ||
ES | 25.05.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
CH | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.05.2007 | ||
ES | 25.05.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
CH | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
SE | 14.05.2007 | ||
ES | 25.05.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
CH | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
SE | 14.05.2007 | ||
ES | 25.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | CH | 14.02.2007 | |
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
SE | 14.05.2007 | ||
ES | 25.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | CH | 14.02.2007 | |
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SE | 14.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | CH | 14.02.2007 | |
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | FI | 14.02.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5534919 ; | [A]EP0786299 (DYNAX CORP [JP]) [A] 1-20 * column 5, line 56 - column 6, line 42 * * claims 2-7 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19800527), vol. 004, no. 072, Database accession no. (M - 013), & JP55034919 A 19800311 (RIKEN CORP) [A] 1-20 * abstract * |