EP1045520 - Arithmetic coding with prevention of carry over propagation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.06.2003 [2003/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/27] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | ||
Former [2000/42] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kimura, Tomohiro c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
Yoshida, Masayuki c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
Ono, Fumitaka c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2000/42] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/42] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner Mozartstrasse 17 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00107249.5 | 03.04.2000 | [2000/42] | Priority number, date | JP19990104162 | 12.04.1999 Original published format: JP 10416299 | [2000/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1045520 | Date: | 18.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1045520 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H03M7/40 | [2000/42] | CPC: |
H03M7/40 (EP,US);
H03M7/42 (KR);
H03M7/6011 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/27] |
Former [2000/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Arithmetische Kodierung mit Vermeidung des Carry-Ripple | [2000/42] | English: | Arithmetic coding with prevention of carry over propagation | [2000/42] | French: | Codage arithmétique avec prévention de propagation de retenue | [2000/42] | Examination procedure | 15.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/46] | 12.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 15.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 07.12.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - KUANG S -R ET AL, "THE DESIGN OF AN ADAPTIVE ON-LINE BINARY ARITHMETIC-CODING CHIP", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS I: FUNDAMENTAL THEORY AND APPLICATIONS,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, (199807), vol. 45, no. 7, ISSN 1057-7122, pages 693 - 706, XP000835356 [A] 1-21 * page 695, column R, paragraph L - page 696, column R, line 33 * * figure 6 * * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/81.703836 |