EP1043882 - Image scanner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PFU LIMITED Nu-98-2, Aza-Unoke, Unoke-machi Kahoku-gun Ishikawa 929-11 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/48] | For all designated states PFU LIMITED Nu-98-2, Aza-Unoke, Unoke-machi Kahoku-gun Ishikawa 929-1192 / JP | ||
Former [2000/41] | For all designated states PFU LIMITED Nu-98-2, Aza-Unoke, Unoke-machi Kahoku-gun Ishikawa 929-1192 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morita, Yuukichi, c/o PFU Limited 98-2, Nu, Aza-Unoke, Unoke-machi Kahoku-gun, Ishikawa 929-1192 / JP | [2000/41] | Representative(s) | Panten, Kirsten, et al 2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel Partnerschaft Schumannstrasse 27 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/41] | Panten, Kirsten, et al Reichel & Reichel, Patentanwälte, Parkstrasse 13 60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 00107521.7 | 07.04.2000 | [2000/41] | Priority number, date | JP19990101964 | 09.04.1999 Original published format: JP 10196499 | [2000/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1043882 | Date: | 11.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1043882 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | [2003/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1043882 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/00, B41J13/10 | [2002/37] | CPC: |
H04N1/00631 (EP,US);
H04N1/00519 (EP,US);
H04N1/0057 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0422 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/41] | H04N1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/39] |
Former [2000/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Bildabtaster | [2000/41] | English: | Image scanner | [2000/41] | French: | Balayeur d'image | [2000/41] | Examination procedure | 19.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/20] | 09.07.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.11.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 25.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.08.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.08.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.08.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 14.08.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 14.08.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 14.08.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 14.08.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 14.08.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.08.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.08.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.08.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 14.08.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 14.08.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 14.08.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.08.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 29.11.2006 | GB | 07.04.2007 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/23] | GB | 07.04.2007 | |
FR | 20.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | GB | 07.04.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0689341 (PFU LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,6 * column 7, line 21 - line 30; figures 3,16 *; | [X]US5568573 (WADA MINORU [JP], et al) [X] 13 * column 3, line 24 - column 5, line 38; figure 4 *; | [A]EP0832748 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [Y]US5785441 (KOBAYASHI YOICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1 * column 20, line 44 - line 56; figures 17,18 *; | [A]DE29814558U (PLUSTEK INC [TW]) [A] 13* figure - *; | [YAX]US5881351 (SHIMOTOSO TADASHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1 * column 4, line 31 - line 63; figure 1 * * figures 2-4 * [A] 7 [X] 6 |