EP1046640 - Process for preparing substituted phenyl boronic acids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.06.2005 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.07.2005 [2005/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clariant GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2000/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haber, Steffen, Dr. Godramsteinerstrasse 5/50 76829 Landau/Pfalz / DE | 02 /
Meudt, Andreas, Dr. Raunheimer Strasse 6 65439 Flörsheim-Weilbach / DE | 03 /
Scherer, Stefan, Dr. Lerchenweg 5 64572 Büttelborn / DE | 04 /
Vollmüller, Frank, Dr. Am Jungstück 18 55130 Mainz / DE | [2000/43] | Application number, filing date | 00107821.1 | 12.04.2000 | [2000/43] | Priority number, date | DE1999117979 | 21.04.1999 Original published format: DE 19917979 | [2000/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1046640 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1046640 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | [2002/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07F5/02, C07F3/02 | [2002/29] | CPC: |
C07F5/025 (EP,US);
C07F3/02 (EP,US);
Y02P20/55 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/43] | C07F5/02 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2003/16] |
Former [2000/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von substituierten Phenyl-boronsäuren | [2000/43] | English: | Process for preparing substituted phenyl boronic acids | [2000/43] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'acides boroniques phéniliques substitués | [2000/43] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/13] | 21.05.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB984363 (WELLCOME FOUND) [X] 11 * page 4; claim 1 * [Y] 1-10; | [Y]WO9802443 (STUDIENGESELLSCHAFT KOHLE MBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-10 * page 7; claim 1 *; | [E]DE19933833 (BAYER AG [DE]) [E] 11 * page 4 - page 6; examples 1-8 * | [DY] - JENDRALLA H. ET AL., "Efficient, simple Procedures for the Large-Scale Preparation of Building Blocks for angiotensin (II) Recptor Antagonists", JUSTUS LIEBIGS ANNALEN DER CHEMIE, (1995), pages 1253 - 1257, XP002199197 [DY] 1-10 * Schema 2 Reaktionssequenz 7 -> 8 -> 3c; page 1254 * | [Y] - FEULNER H. ET AL., "Darstellung und Charakterisierung der p-Formylbenzoesäure", CHEMISCHE BERICHTE, (1990), vol. 123, pages 1841 - 1843, XP002199198 [Y] 1-10 * the whole document * |