EP1029812 - Transfer device for transferring bars in spatial storing system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.07.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2004 | Refusal of application | published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMADA COMPANY, LIMITED 200 Ishida Isehara-shi Kanagawa 259-11 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/34] | For all designated states AMADA COMPANY, LIMITED 200 Ishida Isehara-shi Kanagawa 259-11 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tokiwa, Toru 1130-97, Minamiyana Hadano-shi, Kanagawa 257 / JP | [2000/34] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/34] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00107873.2 | 07.10.1992 | [2000/34] | Priority number, date | JP19910260367 | 08.10.1991 Original published format: JP 26036791 | JP19910261670 | 09.10.1991 Original published format: JP 26167091 | JP19920153404 | 12.06.1992 Original published format: JP 15340492 | JP19920182153 | 09.07.1992 Original published format: JP 18215392 | [2000/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1029812 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65G1/04 | [2000/34] | CPC: |
B65G1/0407 (EP,US);
B65G1/0442 (EP,US);
B65G47/74 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/34] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Fördern von Stäben in einem Regellager | [2000/34] | English: | Transfer device for transferring bars in spatial storing system | [2000/34] | French: | Dispositif et méthode pour le transfert de barreaux dans un magasin à rayonnages | [2000/34] | Examination procedure | 03.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/01] | 18.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2004/37] | 29.03.2004 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 08.04.2004 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2004/37] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP92117127.8 / EP0536724 | EP98108262.1 / EP0872433 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4194864 (EHARA TAKAO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6 * abstract * [A] 7; | [XA]US4016987 (STOLZER PAUL) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 3,5,6; | [A]GB979072 (DONALD MAYER KING) [A] 1,6 * figure -; claim - * | by applicant | US3977542 | US4708556 | DE1222857 | JPS61148806 | JPS63190204U | JPH0252810 |