EP1147929 - Apparatus and method for determining vehicle operating and dynamic parameters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.2006 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.08.2006 [2006/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2005/38] |
Former [2001/43] | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weiberle, Reinhard Kalkaeckerstrasse 10 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | 02 /
Schanzenbach, Matthias Am Hader 8 74246 Eberstadt / DE | [2001/43] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2005/19] |
Former [2001/43] | Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 00107953.2 | 17.04.2000 | [2001/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1147929 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1147929 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B60G17/015 | [2001/43] | CPC: |
B60T8/172 (EP);
B60G17/018 (EP);
B60G17/0195 (EP);
B60G2400/102 (EP);
B60G2400/104 (EP);
B60G2400/106 (EP);
B60G2400/204 (EP);
B60G2400/208 (EP);
B60G2400/822 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE [2002/29] |
Former [2001/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichung und Methode zur Bestimmung von statischen und dynamischen Fahrzeugparametern | [2001/43] | English: | Apparatus and method for determining vehicle operating and dynamic parameters | [2001/43] | French: | Disposif et méthode pour déterminer les paramètres statiques et dynamiques d'un véhicule | [2001/43] | Examination procedure | 24.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/26] | 27.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0597024 ; | [A]JPH03167060 ; | [XA]US5408411 (NAKAMURA MITSURU [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,9,14,15,20 * column 3, line 18 - line 31 * * column 7, line 20 - line 44 * * column 8, line 25 - line 27 * * column 8, line 28 - line 38 * * column 22, line 21 - line 40 * * column 22, line 65 - column 23, line 3 * * column 25, line 34 - line 53 * * column 24, line 13 - line 21 * * figures 1,3,4,7 * [A] 10-13 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930813), vol. 017, no. 439, Database accession no. (M - 1462), & JP05097024 A 19930420 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 6,10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911015), vol. 015, no. 404, Database accession no. (M - 1168), & JP03167060 A 19910718 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP) [A] 6,10 * abstract * | by applicant | DE4039629 | WO9210377 | DE4228414 |