EP1046377 - Microdrive for probes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.04.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.05.2007 [2007/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sherwood Services AG Bahnhofstrasse 29 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | [2005/33] |
Former [2000/43] | For all designated states Sherwood Services AG Schwertstrasse 9 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kynast, Lutz T. 1670 Clairmont Rd. Decatur, GA 30033 / US | 02 /
Rittman, William 77 Locksley Road Lynnfield, MA 01940 / US | 03 /
O'Connor, James P. 11 Connolly Road Billerica, MA 01821 / US | 04 /
Cundari, Michael A. 164 South Street Hingham, MA 02043 / US | 05 /
Cosman, Eric R. 872 Concord Avenue Belmont, MA 02478 / US | [2000/43] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/43] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00108084.5 | 25.04.2000 | [2000/43] | Priority number, date | US19990130867P | 23.04.1999 Original published format: US 130867 P | [2000/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1046377 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1046377 | Date: | 14.02.2001 | [2001/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61B19/00 | [2000/43] | CPC: |
A61B90/11 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00398 (EP,US);
A61B2017/22075 (EP,US);
A61B2017/3409 (EP,US);
A61B2090/0813 (EP,US);
A61B90/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT [2001/44] |
Former [2000/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Mikrometrischer Antrieb für eine Sonde | [2000/43] | English: | Microdrive for probes | [2000/43] | French: | Mécanisme d'entraînement micrométrique d'une sonde | [2000/43] | Examination procedure | 07.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/14] | 01.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/19] | 19.12.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2006 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US3817249 (NICHOLSON M) [X] 1,4,7 * the whole document * [A] 13; | [A]EP0571827 (IBM [US]) [A] 1,7,13* abstract *; | [YA]WO9600044 (CYTOTHERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [Y] 6,8,9,13-16 * page 6, paragraph 3 - page 7, paragraph 1; figure 2 * [A] 1,7; | [A]US5817106 (REAL DOUGLAS D [US]) [A] 1,6-9,13-17 * abstract *; | [XY]WO9851229 (UNIV MINNESOTA [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7,10-12 * page 24, line 1 - page 25, line 2 * * page 28, line 15 - page 30, line 21; figures 30-32,37 * [Y] 6,8,9,13-16 |