EP1050576 - Use of non-ionic surfactant with a low foaming power [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/45] | Non-ionic surfactant with a low foaming power | ||
[2003/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SASOL ITALY S.p.A. Via di Blasi Francesco Paolo 16 90144 Palermo / IT | [2003/21] |
Former [2000/45] | For all designated states CONDEA AUGUSTA S.p.A. Via Reali, 4 20037 Paderno Dugnano (MI) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zatta, Agostino Via Manara, 27 S. Giuliano Mil.se (MI) / IT | 02 /
Monterisi, Francesco Via F.lli Cairoli, 36 Sesto S. Giovanni (MI) / IT | 03 /
Valtorta, Luigi Vicolo Borghetto, 2 Desio, (Milano) / IT | 04 /
Marchesi, Flavio Via Don Minzoni, 20 Arcene, (Bergamo) / IT | [2000/45] | Representative(s) | Zumstein jun., Fritz Zumstein & Klingseisen, Patentanwälte Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/18] | Zumstein, Fritz, Dr. Zumstein & Klingseisen, Patentanwälte, Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/48] | Bordonaro, Salvatore, et al EniTecnologie S.p.A. Patent and Licensing Dept. Via Felice Maritano 26 20097 S. Donato Milanese (MI) / IT | ||
Former [2000/45] | Gennari, Marco, Dr. c/o EniTecnologie S.p.A., BREL, Via F. Maritano, 26 20097 San Donato Milanese, Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 00108136.3 | 13.04.2000 | [2000/45] | Priority number, date | IT1999MI00949 | 04.05.1999 Original published format: IT MI990949 | [2000/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1050576 | Date: | 08.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1050576 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/722, B01F17/42, B01F17/00 | [2000/45] | CPC: |
C11D3/0026 (EP);
C11D1/722 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/45] | Title | German: | Verwendung von einem Schaumarmen nichtionischen Tensid | [2003/33] | English: | Use of non-ionic surfactant with a low foaming power | [2003/33] | French: | Utilisation d'un agent tensio-actif non ionique à faible pouvoir moussant | [2003/33] |
Former [2000/45] | Schaumarmes nichtionisches Tensid | ||
Former [2000/45] | Non-ionic surfactant with a low foaming power | ||
Former [2000/45] | Agent tensio-actif non ionique à faible pouvoir moussant | Examination procedure | 05.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/28] | 10.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 25.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 17.01.2002 | Appeal received No. T0209/02 | 04.02.2002 | Statement of grounds filed | 14.04.2003 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | 14.04.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.04.2003 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.09.2004 | CH | 29.09.2004 | FI | 29.09.2004 | IT | 29.09.2004 | LI | 29.09.2004 | DK | 29.12.2004 | GR | 29.12.2004 | PT | 28.02.2005 | CY | 13.04.2005 | IE | 13.04.2005 | LU | 13.04.2005 | MC | 30.04.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
CH | 29.09.2004 | ||
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
IT | 29.09.2004 | ||
LI | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
CY | 13.04.2005 | ||
IE | 13.04.2005 | ||
LU | 13.04.2005 | ||
MC | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
CH | 29.09.2004 | ||
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
LI | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
CY | 13.04.2005 | ||
IE | 13.04.2005 | ||
LU | 13.04.2005 | ||
MC | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
CH | 29.09.2004 | ||
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
LI | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
CY | 13.04.2005 | ||
IE | 13.04.2005 | ||
LU | 13.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
CH | 29.09.2004 | ||
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
LI | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
CY | 13.04.2005 | ||
IE | 13.04.2005 | ||
LU | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
CH | 29.09.2004 | ||
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
LI | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
IE | 13.04.2005 | ||
LU | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
CH | 29.09.2004 | ||
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
LI | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
IE | 13.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
CH | 29.09.2004 | ||
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
LI | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/25] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
CH | 29.09.2004 | ||
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
LI | 29.09.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 29.09.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5110503 (COHEN ELLIOT [US]) [X] 1-3 * column 3, lines 2-4 * * column 4, lines 28-45 * * column 6, lines 14-52 *; | [A]DE19703083 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] 1-3* page 1, lines 41-47 * |