EP1046757 - Drainage system for sanitairy units [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 04.07.2007 [2007/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wedi, Stephan Dieckstrasse 38 48282 Emsdetten / DE | [2000/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/43] | Representative(s) | Hoffmeister, Helmut Patentanwalt Goldstrasse 36 48147 Münster / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/43] | Hoffmeister, Helmut, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwalt Goldstrasse 36 48147 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 00108321.1 | 15.04.2000 | [2000/43] | Priority number, date | DE1999206845U | 22.04.1999 Original published format: DE 29906845 U | [2000/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1046757 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1046757 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E03F5/04, E03C1/29 | [2000/43] | CPC: |
E03C1/20 (EP);
E03C1/29 (EP);
E03F5/0408 (EP);
E03F2005/0416 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/43] | Title | German: | Abflusssystem für Nasszellen | [2000/43] | English: | Drainage system for sanitairy units | [2000/43] | French: | Système de drainage pour blocs sanitaires | [2000/43] | Examination procedure | 16.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/12] | 30.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 13.01.2005 | CY | 15.04.2005 | LU | 15.04.2005 | MC | 30.04.2005 | [2007/27] |
Former [2007/26] | GR | 13.01.2005 | |
CY | 15.04.2005 | ||
LU | 15.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | GR | 13.01.2005 | |
CY | 15.04.2005 | ||
LU | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | GR | 13.01.2005 | |
LU | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | GR | 13.01.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3654965 (GRAMAIN JEAN CHARLES MARIE); | [Y]DE2759539 (KESSEL) [Y] 1,8 * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 41; figure 1; claims 1-7 *; | [A]DE3627807 (DALLMER GMBH & CO [DE]); | [A]DE3806971 (ALDES [FR]) [A] 7 * figures 1,2,6-9 *; | [YA]GB2283796 (HEPWORTH BUILDING PROD [GB]) [Y] 1,8 * page 9, line 8 - page 9, line 11; figure 3 * [A] 2-7; | [A]GB2301847 (MCALPINE & CO LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 13 - page 4, line 16; figure 1 * |