EP1046734 - Process for producing double carpets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.12.2004 [2004/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHÖNHERR Textilmaschinenbau GmbH Schönherrstrasse 8 09113 Chemnitz / DE | [2003/51] |
Former [2000/43] | For all designated states Schönherr Textilmaschinenbau GmbH. Schönherrstrasse 8 09113 Chemnitz / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gössl, Rainer, Dr. Jahnsdorfer Strasse 17 09387 Leukersdorf / DE | [2000/43] | Representative(s) | Schneider, Manfred Patentanwalt Hauptstrasse 2 b 09437 Börnichen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/17] | Schneider, Manfred Patentanwaltsbüro Schneider Annaberger Strasse 73 D-09111 Chemnitz / DE | ||
Former [2000/43] | Schneider, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing. Anwaltssozietät Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Annaberger Strasse 73 09111 Chemnitz / DE | Application number, filing date | 00108623.0 | 20.04.2000 | [2000/43] | Priority number, date | DE1999118171 | 21.04.1999 Original published format: DE 19918171 | [2000/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1046734 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1046734 | Date: | 12.09.2001 | [2001/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1046734 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | D03D27/10 | [2000/43] | CPC: |
D03D27/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [2002/23] |
Former [2000/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Doppelteppichgewebe | [2000/43] | English: | Process for producing double carpets | [2000/43] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de tapis doubles | [2000/43] | Examination procedure | 05.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/01] | 13.03.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.07.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 02.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.04.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2060502 (KAUFMAN FRANK M) [A] 1 * column 1, line 14 - column 1, line 53; figure 1 *; | [A]US2108046 (DROBILE ALBERT W) [A] 1 * column 1, line 22 - column 2, line 39; figures 1,3 *; | [A]EP0119184 (OSTA CARPETS N V [BE]) [A] 1 * figure 2 *; | [A]DE127300 (R SCHWARTZ & CO) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE175757 (FÖRSTER WILHELM) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1072705 (WIELE MICHEL VAN DE NV [BE]) [E] 1-3,7-9 * figures 1,2; claims 1-10 * |