EP1054258 - Homogeneous enzyme immunoassay process using second antibody [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.11.2006 [2006/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa 250-0123 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/47] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa 250-01 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shinoki, Hiroshi Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 11-46, 3-chome, Senzui Asaka-shi, Saitama / JP | 02 /
Seshimoto, Osamu Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 11-46, 3-chome, Senzui Asaka-shi, Saitama / JP | [2000/47] | Representative(s) | Albrecht, Thomas, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/47] | Albrecht, Thomas, Dr., et al Kraus, Weisert & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00109057.0 | 28.04.2000 | [2000/47] | Priority number, date | JP19990120940 | 28.04.1999 Original published format: JP 12094099 | [2000/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1054258 | Date: | 22.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1054258 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/48, G01N33/543, G01N33/58 | [2000/47] | CPC: |
C12Q1/40 (EP);
G01N33/542 (EP);
G01N33/54306 (EP);
G01N33/581 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/32] |
Former [2000/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Homogenes Enzym-Immunoassay- Verfahren mit zweitem Antikörper | [2005/48] | English: | Homogeneous enzyme immunoassay process using second antibody | [2000/47] | French: | Méthode homogène de dosage immunologique enzymatique faisant intervenir un second anticorps | [2005/48] |
Former [2000/47] | Homogenes Enzym-Immunoassay Verfahren mit zwei Antikörpern | ||
Former [2000/47] | Méthode homogène de dosage immunologique enzymatique faisant intervenir un second anticorps contre le premier anticorps | Examination procedure | 15.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/19] | 23.05.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 21.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.07.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0579250 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-3 * claim - *; | [A]US4203802 (RUBENSTEIN KENNETH E [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * claim - *; | [A]US4235960 (SASSE EDWARD A [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * claim - *; | [A]EP0813064 (BAYER AG [US]) [A] 1-3 * claim - *; | [A]EP0182546 (POLYCLONAL ANTIBODIES LTD [GB]) [A] 1-3 * claim - *; | [A]US4530900 (MARSHALL DAVID L [US]) [A] 1-3 * claim - * |