EP1052165 - Endless rubber track and vehicle containing such track [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.06.2008 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company 1144 East Market Street Akron, OH 44316-0001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/32] | For all designated states THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY 1144 East Market Street Akron Ohio 44316-0001 / US | ||
Former [2000/46] | For all designated states THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY 1144 East Market Street Akron, Ohio 44316-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rodgers, Michael Brendan 3551 South Sunnyfield Drive Copley, Ohio 44321-1949 / US | 02 /
Krishnan, Ram Murthy 184 Steeplechase Lane Munroe Falls, Ohio 44262 / US | 03 /
Sandstrom, Paul Harry 96 Milton Drive Tallmadge, Ohio 44278 / US | 04 /
Maly, Neil Arthur 953 Maple Street Tallmadge, Ohio 44278 / US | 05 /
Gordon, Larry Ashley 2892 Ironwood Drive Akron, Ohio 44312 / US | [2000/46] | Representative(s) | Kutsch, Bernd Goodyear S.A. Patent Department 7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2003/43] | Kutsch, Bernd Goodyear S.A. Patent Department 7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | ||
Former [2000/46] | Leitz, Paul Goodyear Technical Center-Luxembourg Patent-Department L-7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | Application number, filing date | 00109428.3 | 03.05.2000 | [2000/46] | Priority number, date | US19990310509 | 12.05.1999 Original published format: US 310509 | [2000/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1052165 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1052165 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | [2003/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1052165 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B62D55/24 | [2000/46] | CPC: |
B62D55/24 (EP);
C08L7/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L7/00, C08L2666/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/14] |
Former [2000/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Endlose Gummiraupenkette und Fahrzeug ausgerüstet mit solcher Raupenkette | [2000/46] | English: | Endless rubber track and vehicle containing such track | [2000/46] | French: | Chenille sans fin en caoutchouc et véhicule équipé avec cette chenille | [2000/46] | Examination procedure | 09.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/12] | 01.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 19.11.2007 | GB | 03.05.2008 | [2009/29] |
Former [2008/08] | ES | 19.11.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]JPH11139359 ; | [A]US3781067 (MASTERS F, et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]US4279449 (MARTIN BILLY P, et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * column 4, line 37 *; | [A]EP0900826 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [A] * abstract * | [PX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990831), vol. 1999, no. 10, & JP11139359 A 19990525 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [PX] 1-7 * abstract * |