EP1051037 - Inspection system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.04.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Everest-VIT, Inc. (a New Jersey Corporation) 199 Highway 206 New Jersey 07836-4500 / US | [2000/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Drost, Jeffrey David 11 Schoolhouse Lane Flanders, NJ 07836 / US | 02 /
Mooney, David John 14 Brewster Place Flanders, NJ 07836 / US | 03 /
Salvati, Jon Robert 3552 County Line Road Skaneateles, NY 13152 / US | [2001/45] |
Former [2000/45] | 01 /
Drost, Jeffrey David 11 Schoolhouse Lane Flanders, NJ 07836 / US | ||
02 /
Mooney, David John 14 Brewster Place Flanders, NJ 07836 / US | |||
03 /
Salvati, Jon Robert 2313 East Lake Road Skaneateles, NY 13152 / US | Representative(s) | Goddard, David John, et al Harrison Goddard Foote LLP 4th Floor, Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/45] | Goddard, David John, et al Harrison Goddard Foote, 1 Stockport Road, Marple Stockport SK6 6BD / GB | Application number, filing date | 00109509.0 | 04.05.2000 | [2000/45] | Priority number, date | US19990132400 | 04.05.1999 Original published format: US 132400 | [2000/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1051037 | Date: | 08.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1051037 | Date: | 29.08.2001 | [2001/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/18, F16M13/04 | [2001/35] | CPC: |
E03F7/12 (EP,US);
G01N21/954 (EP,US);
H04N7/183 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/45] | H04N7/18 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2002/21] |
Former [2000/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Inspektionssystem und -Verfahren | [2000/45] | English: | Inspection system and method | [2000/45] | French: | Procédé et système d'inspection | [2000/45] | Examination procedure | 05.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/17] | 01.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/21] | 12.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2009 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5712677 (FRAERING JR CAMILLE M [US], et al) [A] 1,5,7,10 * column 1, line 1 - line 16 * * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 24; figures 1-3 * * column 4, line 6 - line 17 *; | [A]FR2705152 (MERIAUX DELBARRE ROMAIN [FR]) [A] 1,7,9 * page 2, line 1 - line 10 * * page 2, line 31 - page 5, line 22; figure 1 *; | [A]US5134471 (GENDRON ALAIN [CA], et al) [A] 1,2,7 * column 1, line 37 - column 2, line 16; figure 1 * |