EP1050242 - Height adjustable device for furniture items in particular for elevating tables [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONRAD MERKT GMBH Max-Planck-Strasse 30 D-78549 Spaichingen / DE | [2000/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Merkt, Manfred Hauffstrasse 4 78549 Spaichingen / DE | [2000/45] | Representative(s) | Otten, Roth, Dobler & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Grosstobeler Strasse 39 88276 Berg / Ravensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Eisele, Otten, Roth & Dobler Patentanwälte Karlstrasse 8 88212 Ravensburg / DE | ||
Former [2000/45] | Patentanwälte Eisele, Otten, Roth & Dobler Karlstrasse 8 88212 Ravensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 00109607.2 | 05.05.2000 | [2000/45] | Priority number, date | DE1999120939 | 07.05.1999 Original published format: DE 19920939 | [2000/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1050242 | Date: | 08.11.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1050242 | Date: | 28.11.2001 | [2001/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1050242 | Date: | 30.06.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A47B9/12 | [2000/45] | CPC: |
A47B9/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/45] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Höhenverstellung von Möbelstücken, insbesondere Hubtischen | [2000/45] | English: | Height adjustable device for furniture items in particular for elevating tables | [2000/45] | French: | Dispositif de réglage en hauteur pour pièces d'ameublement en particulier pour tables élévatrices | [2000/45] | Examination procedure | 07.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/16] | 19.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 30.06.2004 | FR | 30.06.2004 | GB | 30.06.2004 | IE | 30.06.2004 | IT | 30.06.2004 | NL | 30.06.2004 | DK | 30.09.2004 | GR | 30.09.2004 | SE | 30.09.2004 | ES | 11.10.2004 | PT | 30.11.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | FI | 30.06.2004 | |
FR | 30.06.2004 | ||
GB | 30.06.2004 | ||
IE | 30.06.2004 | ||
IT | 30.06.2004 | ||
NL | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 30.09.2004 | ||
GR | 30.09.2004 | ||
SE | 30.09.2004 | ||
ES | 11.10.2004 | ||
Former [2006/47] | FI | 30.06.2004 | |
FR | 30.06.2004 | ||
GB | 30.06.2004 | ||
IE | 30.06.2004 | ||
NL | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 30.09.2004 | ||
GR | 30.09.2004 | ||
SE | 30.09.2004 | ||
ES | 11.10.2004 | ||
Former [2006/32] | FI | 30.06.2004 | |
FR | 30.06.2004 | ||
GB | 30.06.2004 | ||
IE | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 30.09.2004 | ||
GR | 30.09.2004 | ||
SE | 30.09.2004 | ||
ES | 11.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | FI | 30.06.2004 | |
GB | 30.06.2004 | ||
IE | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 30.09.2004 | ||
GR | 30.09.2004 | ||
SE | 30.09.2004 | ||
ES | 11.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 30.06.2004 | |
IE | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 30.09.2004 | ||
GR | 30.09.2004 | ||
SE | 30.09.2004 | ||
ES | 11.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | FI | 30.06.2004 | |
DK | 30.09.2004 | ||
GR | 30.09.2004 | ||
SE | 30.09.2004 | ||
ES | 11.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | FI | 30.06.2004 | |
DK | 30.09.2004 | ||
GR | 30.09.2004 | ||
SE | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | FI | 30.06.2004 | |
GR | 30.09.2004 | ||
SE | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 30.06.2004 | |
SE | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | SE | 30.09.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE1429534 (FLEISCHER METALLWARENFAB W) [X] 1,3,13 * the whole document * [A] 10; | [A]DE19626856 (HECKMANN PETER [DE]) [A] 1,3,13* the whole document * | by applicant | DE8411361U |