EP1050589 - Direct reduction method and rotary hearth furnace therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.07.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.08.2003 [2003/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA KOBE SEIKO SHO 3-18, Wakinohama-cho 1-Chome, Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/45] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Kobe Seiko Sho 3-18, Wakinohama-cho 1-Chome, Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nishimura, Makoto, Kobe Corp. Labs Kobe Steel Ltd. 5-5, Takatsukadai 1-chome, Nishi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-2271 / JP | 02 /
Tanaka, Hidetoshi, Kakogawa Works Kobe Steel Ltd. Kanazawa-cho 1 Kakogawa-shi, Hyogo 675-0137 / JP | [2000/45] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/45] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00109640.3 | 05.05.2000 | [2000/45] | Priority number, date | JP19990126330 | 06.05.1999 Original published format: JP 12633099 | [2000/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1050589 | Date: | 08.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C21B13/10, C21B13/08, C22B5/10, F27B3/06, F27B3/20, F27B9/16, F27B9/30, C22B1/216, F27B9/36 | [2000/45] | CPC: |
C21B13/10 (EP,KR,US);
C21B13/105 (EP,US);
C22B1/216 (EP,US);
C22B5/10 (EP,US);
F27B9/16 (EP,US);
F27B9/3011 (EP,US);
F27B2009/3055 (EP,US);
F27B2009/3607 (EP,US);
F27B2009/3646 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/45] | Title | German: | Direktreduktionsverfahren und Drehherdofen dafür | [2000/45] | English: | Direct reduction method and rotary hearth furnace therefor | [2000/45] | French: | Procédé de réduction directe et four à sole tournante à cet effet | [2000/45] | Examination procedure | 18.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/45] | 28.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/35] | 11.02.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YDA]JPH1060514 ; | [YP]US5989019 (NISHIMURA MAKOTO [JP], et al) [YP] 4-6 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5885521 (MEISSNER DAVID C [US], et al) [Y] 4-6 * column 7, line 1 - line 12; figure 2 *; | [Y]EP0828127 (DEMAG ITALIMPIANTI SPA [IT]) [Y] 4-6 * column 2, line 43 - line 45; figures 1,2 * * column 3, line 29 - line 44 *; | [A]US5567224 (KUNDRAT DAVID M [US]) [A] 1,4 * column 1; figure 2 *; | [A]EP0885972 (PRAXAIR TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [A] 1-6 * page 3 - page 4; figure 1; claims 1-10 *; | [A]BE1008579 (CENTRE RECH METALLURGIQUE [BE]) [A] 1-6 * page 6, line 7 - page 9, line 37; figures 1-4 * | [YDA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980630), vol. 1998, no. 08, & JP10060514 A 19980303 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [YD] 4-6 * abstract * [A] 1-3 |