EP1051942 - Appliance switching mechanism and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Salton, Inc. 550 Business Center Drive, The Kensinger Center Mt. Prospect, IL 60056 / US | [2000/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huggler, Peter 8110 Route N Columbia, MO 65203 / US | [2000/46] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2000/46] | Application number, filing date | 00109656.9 | 05.05.2000 | [2000/46] | Priority number, date | US19990307080 | 07.05.1999 Original published format: US 307080 | [2000/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1051942 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1051942 | Date: | 22.05.2002 | [2002/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1051942 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A47J37/08 | [2000/46] | CPC: |
A47J37/0842 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/46] | Title | German: | Schaltmechanismus und -methode eines Gerätes | [2000/46] | English: | Appliance switching mechanism and method | [2000/46] | French: | Dispositif et méthode de commutation d'un appareil | [2000/46] | Examination procedure | 19.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/03] | 21.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 18.11.2004 | AT | 05.05.2005 | CY | 05.05.2005 | LU | 05.05.2005 | PT | 05.05.2005 | FI | 06.05.2005 | SE | 06.05.2005 | [2008/29] |
Former [2007/26] | GR | 18.11.2004 | |
AT | 05.05.2005 | ||
CY | 05.05.2005 | ||
LU | 05.05.2005 | ||
FI | 06.05.2005 | ||
SE | 06.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | GR | 18.11.2004 | |
AT | 05.05.2005 | ||
CY | 05.05.2005 | ||
FI | 06.05.2005 | ||
SE | 06.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/43] | GR | 18.11.2004 | |
AT | 05.05.2005 | ||
FI | 06.05.2005 | ||
SE | 06.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | GR | 18.11.2004 | |
FI | 06.05.2005 | ||
SE | 06.05.2005 | ||
Former [2005/18] | GR | 18.11.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE3731959 (SEVERIN & CO GMBH A) [X] 1-4,6-10,12-16,18-21,40-43 * column 2, line 43 - column 3, line 34 * * column 3, lines 54-61 * * column 4, lines 27-66 * * column 5, lines 9-68 * * figure - * [A] 5,11,17; | [A]US5304782 (MCNAIR JOHN D [AU], et al) [A] * column 5, line 23 - column 6, line 45; figure 4 *; | [E]WO0124675 (SEB SA [FR], et al) [E] 1-21,40-43 * page 6, line 14 - page 12, line 20; figures 1-5 * |