EP1024426 - High performance RISC microprocessor architecture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.12.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/31] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nguyen, Le Trong 15096 Danielle Place Monte Sereno, California 95032 / US | 02 /
Lentz, Derek J. 17400 Phillips Avenue Los Gatos, California 95032 / US | 03 /
Miyayama, Yoshiyuki 2171 Rancho McCormick Boulevard Santa Clara, California 95050 / US | 04 /
Garg, Sanjiv 46820 Sentinel Drive Freemont, California 94539 / US | 05 /
Hagiwara, Yasuaki 5247 Sussex Place Newark, California 94560-1953 / US | 06 /
Wang, Johannes 25 King Street Redwood City, California 94062 / US | 07 /
Lau, Tei-Li 3075 Louis Road Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | 08 /
Trang, Quang H. 2045 Mayfield Avenue San Jose, California 95130 / US | [2000/43] |
Former [2000/31] | 01 /
Nguyen, Le Trong 15096 Danielle Place Monte Sereno, California 95032 / US | ||
02 /
Lentz, Derek J. 17400 Phillips Avenue Los Gatos, California 95032 / US | |||
03 /
Miyayama, Yoshiyuki 2171 Rancho McCormick Boulevard Santa Clara, California 95050 / US | |||
04 /
Garg, Sanjiv 46820 Sentinel Drive Freemont, California 94539 / US | |||
05 /
Hagiwara, Yasuaki 2250 Monroe Street, Apt. 274 Santa Clara, California 95050 / US | |||
06 /
Wang, Johannes 25 King Street Redwood City, California 94062 / US | |||
07 /
Lau, Tei-Li 3075 Louis Road Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | |||
08 /
Trang, Quang H. 2045 Mayfield Avenue San Jose, California 95130 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/31] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00109747.6 | 07.07.1992 | [2000/31] | Priority number, date | US19910727006 | 08.07.1991 Original published format: US 727006 | [2000/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1024426 | Date: | 02.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1024426 | Date: | 08.08.2001 | [2001/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1024426 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/08, G06F9/38 | [2001/14] | CPC: |
G06F9/3822 (EP,US);
G06F9/38 (KR);
G06F9/06 (KR);
G06F9/30 (KR);
G06F9/30061 (EP,US);
G06F9/30072 (EP,US);
G06F9/30112 (EP,US);
G06F9/30116 (EP,US);
G06F9/30123 (EP,US);
G06F9/3013 (EP,US);
G06F9/30134 (EP,US);
G06F9/30167 (EP,US);
G06F9/327 (EP,US);
G06F9/3802 (EP,US);
G06F9/3804 (EP,US);
G06F9/3806 (EP,US);
G06F9/3826 (EP,US);
G06F9/3834 (EP,US);
G06F9/3836 (EP,US);
G06F9/3838 (EP,US);
G06F9/384 (EP,US);
G06F9/3851 (EP,US);
G06F9/3856 (EP,US);
G06F9/3858 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/31] | G06F9/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [2000/31] | Title | German: | Hochleistungsarchitektur für RISC-Mikroprozessor | [2000/31] | English: | High performance RISC microprocessor architecture | [2000/31] | French: | Architecture de microprocesseur RISC à hautes performances | [2000/31] | Examination procedure | 25.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/38] | 22.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 03.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP92914387.3 / EP0547241 | Divisional application(s) | EP03024585.6 / EP1385085 | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.02.2004 | BE | 25.02.2004 | CH | 25.02.2004 | IT | 25.02.2004 | LI | 25.02.2004 | NL | 25.02.2004 | DK | 25.05.2004 | GR | 25.05.2004 | SE | 25.05.2004 | ES | 05.06.2004 | LU | 07.07.2004 | MC | 31.07.2004 | [2007/35] |
Former [2005/23] | AT | 25.02.2004 | |
BE | 25.02.2004 | ||
CH | 25.02.2004 | ||
LI | 25.02.2004 | ||
NL | 25.02.2004 | ||
DK | 25.05.2004 | ||
GR | 25.05.2004 | ||
SE | 25.05.2004 | ||
ES | 05.06.2004 | ||
LU | 07.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 25.02.2004 | |
BE | 25.02.2004 | ||
CH | 25.02.2004 | ||
LI | 25.02.2004 | ||
NL | 25.02.2004 | ||
DK | 25.05.2004 | ||
GR | 25.05.2004 | ||
SE | 25.05.2004 | ||
ES | 05.06.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/05] | AT | 25.02.2004 | |
BE | 25.02.2004 | ||
CH | 25.02.2004 | ||
LI | 25.02.2004 | ||
NL | 25.02.2004 | ||
DK | 25.05.2004 | ||
GR | 25.05.2004 | ||
SE | 25.05.2004 | ||
ES | 05.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 25.02.2004 | |
BE | 25.02.2004 | ||
CH | 25.02.2004 | ||
LI | 25.02.2004 | ||
DK | 25.05.2004 | ||
GR | 25.05.2004 | ||
SE | 25.05.2004 | ||
ES | 05.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 25.02.2004 | |
BE | 25.02.2004 | ||
CH | 25.02.2004 | ||
LI | 25.02.2004 | ||
GR | 25.05.2004 | ||
SE | 25.05.2004 | ||
ES | 05.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | AT | 25.02.2004 | |
CH | 25.02.2004 | ||
LI | 25.02.2004 | ||
GR | 25.05.2004 | ||
SE | 25.05.2004 | ||
ES | 05.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 25.02.2004 | |
CH | 25.02.2004 | ||
LI | 25.02.2004 | ||
GR | 25.05.2004 | ||
SE | 25.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 25.02.2004 | |
GR | 25.05.2004 | ||
SE | 25.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | GR | 25.05.2004 | |
SE | 25.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | SE | 25.05.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0240870 (SYMBOLICS INC [US]) [Y] 5,6,12,13,22,24 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0381471 (DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORP [US]) [A] 1,18,26,27 * page 2, line 44 - page 3, line 1 ; page 6, lines 24-34 *; | [A]EP0413434 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 5,6,12,13,22,24* the whole document *; | [XY] - POPESCU V ET AL, "THE METAFLOW ARCHITECTURE", IEEE MICRO,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, (19910601), vol. 11, no. 3, ISSN 0272-1732, pages 10 - 13,63-73, XP000237231 [X] 1-4,7-11,14-21,23,25-28 * the whole document * [Y] 5,6,12,13,22,24 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/40.87564 |