EP1053879 - Liquid consumption status detecting method, liquid container, and ink cartridge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2017 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, LU | published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [2016/16] |
Former [2000/47] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Usui, Minoru c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken, Japan / JP | 02 /
Tsukada, Kenji c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken, Japan / JP | 03 /
Kanaya, Munehide c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken, Japan / JP | 04 /
Tamura, Noboru c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken, Japan / JP | [2016/16] |
Former [2000/47] | 01 /
Usui, Minoru c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken, Japan / JP | ||
02 /
Tsukada, Kenji c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken, Japan / JP | |||
03 /
Kanaya, Munehide c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken, Japan / JP | |||
04 /
Tamura, Noboru c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken, Japan / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2016/16] |
Former [2000/47] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00110256.5 | 19.05.2000 | [2000/47] | Priority number, date | JP19990139683 | 20.05.1999 Original published format: JP 13968399 | JP19990147538 | 27.05.1999 Original published format: JP 14753899 | JP19990256522 | 10.09.1999 Original published format: JP 25652299 | [2000/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1053879 | Date: | 22.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1053879 | Date: | 06.12.2000 | [2000/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1053879 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/175, G01F23/296 | [2000/49] | CPC: |
G01F23/2966 (EP,US);
B41J2/175 (KR);
B41J2/17503 (EP,US);
B41J2/17513 (EP,US);
B41J2/1752 (EP,US);
B41J2/17523 (EP,US);
B41J2/17546 (EP,US);
B41J2/17553 (EP,US);
B41J2/17566 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/47] | B41J2/175 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2016/16] |
Former [2000/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erfassung des Flüssigkeitsverbrauchszustandes, Flüssigkeitsbehälter und Tintenkartusche | [2000/47] | English: | Liquid consumption status detecting method, liquid container, and ink cartridge | [2000/47] | French: | Procédé de détection de l'état de consommation de liquide, réservoir de liquide et cartouche d'encre | [2000/47] | Examination procedure | 19.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/47] | 17.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP08020726.9 / EP2036732 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 16.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 22.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.04.2016 | BE | 20.04.2016 | CY | 20.04.2016 | DK | 20.04.2016 | ES | 20.04.2016 | FI | 20.04.2016 | IT | 20.04.2016 | MC | 20.04.2016 | NL | 20.04.2016 | SE | 20.04.2016 | IE | 19.05.2016 | LU | 19.05.2016 | CH | 31.05.2016 | LI | 31.05.2016 | GR | 21.07.2016 | PT | 22.08.2016 | [2018/29] |
Former [2017/38] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
IE | 19.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 20.04.2016 | |
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/37] | BE | 31.05.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4770038 (ZUCKERWAR ALLAN J [US], et al) [A] 1,13,20,35 * figure 1 * * column 2, line 46 - column 3, line 64 *; | [A]US5586085 (LICHTE LEO J [US]) [A] 1,13,20,35 * figures 1,4A,4B,5 * * column 7, line 62 - column 10, line 21 ** column 13, line 36 - column 14, line 39 *; | [A]US5689288 (WIMMER GUENTHER W [US], et al) [A] 1,13,20,35 * figures 1,2 * * column 3, line 58 - column 6, line 27 *; | [A]US5774136 (BARBEHENN GEORGE [US], et al) [A] 1,13,20,35 * figures 3B,5, * * column 5, line 51 - column 7, line 13 * * column 7, line 58 - column 8, line 35 * | by applicant | US4770038 | US5586085 | US5689288 | US5774136 |