EP1054425 - Modular auxiliary electrical device, particularly for minimum operating voltage control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEWISS S.p.A. Via A. Volta 1 24069 Cenate Sotto (Bergamo) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/47] | For all designated states GEWISS S.p.A. Via A. Volta 1 I-24069 Cenate Sotto (Bergamo) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bosatelli, Domenico Via Degli Alpini, 13 24069 Cenate Sotto, (Bergamo) / IT | 02 /
Pianezzola, Sergio Via Della Fratellanza, 21 21100 Calcinate del Pesce, (Varese) / IT | 03 /
Contardi, Augusto Via Rovani, 7 21100 Varese / IT | [2000/47] | Representative(s) | Forattini, Amelia, et al Internazionale Brevetti Ingg. ZINI, MARANESI & C. S.r.l. Piazza Castello 1 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/47] | Forattini, Amelia, et al c/o Internazionale Brevetti Ingg. ZINI, MARANESI & C. S.r.l. Piazza Castello 1 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 00110364.7 | 15.05.2000 | [2000/47] | Priority number, date | IT1999MI01070 | 17.05.1999 Original published format: IT MI991070 | [2000/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1054425 | Date: | 22.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01H83/12 | [2000/47] | CPC: |
H01H83/12 (EP);
H01H2071/0278 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2001/32] |
Former [2000/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Modulares elektrisches Hilfsgerät, insbesondere für Unterspannungsüberwachung | [2000/47] | English: | Modular auxiliary electrical device, particularly for minimum operating voltage control | [2000/47] | French: | Appareil électrique auxiliaire modulaire, notamment pour le cotrôle du minimum de tension | [2000/47] | Examination procedure | 09.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/26] | 23.05.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.02.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 10.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/29] | 02.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.07.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4246558 (ZUBATY MARTIN V, et al) [X] 1-4 * column 5, line 24 - column 7, line 57; figures 1-8 * [Y] 5; | [Y]DE1028670 (WYSIAELEKTROGERAETEBAU G M B H) [Y] 5 * column 3, line 20 - line 24 * |