EP1058007 - Gerotor motor and brake assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.03.2004 [2004/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eaton Corporation Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/49] | For all designated states EATON CORPORATION Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wenker, Wayne Bernard, Chief Engineer 15624 Canyon Ridge Eden Prairie, Minnesota 55347-1405 / US | 02 /
Barto, Michael Wayne, Product Engineer 2208 Eastway Avenue Shakopee, Minnesota 55379-3922 / US | 03 /
Yakimow, Scott Edward, Product Engineer 51 McAndrews Road W., No. 324 Burnsville, Minnesota 55337-5706 / US | [2000/49] | Representative(s) | Schorer, Reinhard, et al Schwan Schorer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Bauerstrasse 22 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/49] | Schorer, Reinhard, et al Schwan Schwan Schorer Patentanwälte Elfenstrasse 32 81739 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00110434.8 | 16.05.2000 | [2000/49] | Priority number, date | US19990325271 | 03.06.1999 Original published format: US 325271 | [2000/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1058007 | Date: | 06.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1058007 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | [2001/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1058007 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F04C2/10, F04C15/00 | [2000/49] | CPC: |
F04C2/104 (EP,US);
F04C15/0057 (EP,US);
F04C15/0084 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2002/36] |
Former [2000/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Innenzahnradmotor und Feststellbremse | [2000/49] | English: | Gerotor motor and brake assembly | [2000/49] | French: | Moteur à engrenage intérieur avec frein de stationnement | [2000/49] | Examination procedure | 11.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/21] | 24.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0870922 (EATON CORP [US]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 14 - line 20; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]WO8401800 (NICHOLS CO W H [US]) [A] 1 * page 6, line 24; figure 1 *; | [A]JPS5885370 ; | [A]JPH074340 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830812), vol. 007, no. 183, Database accession no. (M - 235), & JP58085370 A 19830521 (SUMITOMO IITON KIKI KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950531), vol. 1995, no. 04, & JP07004340 A 19950110 (SUMITOMO EATON KIKI KK) [A] 1 * abstract * |