EP1039540 - Semiconductor device having an improved structure for preventing cracks, improved small-sized semiconductor and method of manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.12.2001 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.01.2002 [2002/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oki Electric Industry Co., Ltd. 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/39] | For all designated states Oki Electric Industry Co., Ltd. 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamada, Shigeru, c/o Oki Electric Ind. Co., Ltd. 7-12, Toranomon, 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Uchida, Yasufumi, c/o Oki Electric Ind. Co., Ltd. 7-12, Toranomon, 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Murakami, Noriko, c/o Oki Electric Ind. Co., Ltd. 7-12, Toranomon, 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Shizuno, Yoshinori, c/o Oki Electric Ind. Co., Ltd. 7-12, Toranomon, 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2000/39] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 02 51 80076 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/39] | Betten & Resch Reichenbachstrasse 19 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00110728.3 | 24.10.1996 | [2000/39] | Priority number, date | JP19950275817 | 24.10.1995 Original published format: JP 27581795 | JP19950275818 | 24.10.1995 Original published format: JP 27581895 | JP19950275819 | 24.10.1995 Original published format: JP 27581995 | JP19950275820 | 24.10.1995 Original published format: JP 27582095 | [2000/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1039540 | Date: | 27.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/495, H01L23/31, H01L21/60, H01L23/498, H01L23/367 | [2000/39] | CPC: |
H01L24/11 (EP,US);
H01L23/055 (EP,US);
H01L23/3107 (EP,US);
H01L23/3121 (EP,US);
H01L23/3677 (EP,US);
H01L23/49503 (EP,US);
H01L23/49531 (EP,US);
H01L23/49811 (EP,US);
H01L23/49827 (EP,US);
H01L24/05 (EP,US);
H01L24/13 (EP,US);
H01L24/16 (EP,US);
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
H01L24/73 (EP,US);
H01L24/78 (EP,US);
H01L24/81 (EP,US);
H01L24/85 (EP,US);
H01L24/91 (EP,US);
H01L2224/0401 (EP,US);
H01L2224/04042 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05556 (EP,US);
H01L2224/11334 (EP,US);
H01L2224/1134 (EP,US);
H01L2224/1329 (EP,US);
H01L2224/133 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32245 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45144 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48247 (EP,US);
H01L2224/484 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48465 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48471 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48599 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73265 (EP,US);
H01L2224/78301 (EP,US);
H01L2224/81801 (EP,US);
H01L2224/85205 (EP,US);
H01L2224/8592 (EP,US);
H01L2224/92 (EP,US);
H01L2224/92247 (EP,US);
H01L24/45 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00013 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01005 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01006 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01023 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01077 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01078 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01079 (EP,US);
H01L2924/014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/09701 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15311 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/1329, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/133, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/45144, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48247, H01L2224/48471, H01L2924/00, H01L2924/00012 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48465, H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48465, H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00, H01L2924/00012 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48465, H01L2224/48227 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48465, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48465, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48465, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/484, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32245, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00012 (US,EP);
H01L2224/85205, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2224/92247, H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32245, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00013, H01L2224/13099 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/05556 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/05599 (EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/85399 (EP);
H01L2924/181, H01L2924/00012 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | [2001/24] |
Former [2000/39] | DE, FR, NL | Title | German: | Halbleitereinrichtung mit verbesserter Struktur zur Vermeidung von Rissen und Herstellungsverfahren | [2000/39] | English: | Semiconductor device having an improved structure for preventing cracks, improved small-sized semiconductor and method of manufacturing the same | [2000/39] | French: | Dispositif semi-conducteur présentant une structure améliorée pour éviter les craquements et procédé de fabrication | [2000/39] | Examination procedure | 13.09.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/05] | 08.08.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/05] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96117092.5 / EP0771029 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.05.2001 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 16.05.2001 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0470559 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5 * column 2, line 23 - line 34 * * column 4, line 28 - line 35 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]JPH0582677 ; | [A]JPH07122677 ; | [A]JPS6276747 ; | [A]JPS59193033 | [X] - TRIBBEY D A ET AL, "SILICON-CARBON RESIN (GLOB TOP) OVER SILICONE DIE COAT FOR REDUCED STRESS ENCAPSULATION", MOTOROLA TECHNICAL DEVELOPMENTS, (19920501), vol. 15, page 119, XP000306172 [X] 1,4,5 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930803), vol. 017, no. 415, Database accession no. (E - 1407), & JP05082677 A 19930402 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PENNISI R ET AL, "A NEW LIQUID ENCAPSULANT FOR IC PACKAGING", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS AND TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE (ECTC), SAN DIEGO, MAY 18 - 20, 1992, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19920518), no. CONF. 42, pages 1015 - 1017, XP000474050 [A] 1 * page 1015, paragraph 2; figure 2 * * page 1016, paragraph 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ECTC.1992.204329 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950929), vol. 095, no. 008, & JP07122677 A 19950512 (HITACHI LTD;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870908), vol. 011, no. 277, Database accession no. (E - 538), & JP62076747 A 19870408 (SHINDENGEN ELECTRIC MFG CO LTD) [A] 2,3 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850307), vol. 009, no. 053, Database accession no. (E - 301), & JP59193033 A 19841101 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO KK) [A] 2,3 * abstract * |