EP1058220 - Communications system for a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.12.2004 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.02.2005 [2005/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | [2000/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Göbel, Fridjof Christofstrasse 4 74354 Besigheim / DE | 02 /
Lenart, Siegleif Claude-Dornier-Strasse 43 73760 Ostfildern / DE | 03 /
Spaney, Roger Fichtenstrasse 38 71088 Holzgerlingen / DE | 04 /
Starman, Frank Oberkircher Strasse 33 71034 Böblingen / DE | [2000/49] | Application number, filing date | 00110749.9 | 19.05.2000 | [2000/49] | Priority number, date | DE1999125570 | 04.06.1999 Original published format: DE 19925570 | [2000/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1058220 | Date: | 06.12.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1058220 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/09 | [2000/49] | CPC: |
G08G1/09 (EP);
H04L67/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2001/34] |
Former [2000/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kommunikationssystem für ein Fahrzeug | [2000/49] | English: | Communications system for a vehicle | [2000/49] | French: | Système de communications pour véhicule | [2000/49] | Examination procedure | 10.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/15] | 27.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0387516 (GRUNDIG EMV [DE]) [A] 2 * column 1, lines 25-47 * * column 4, lines 9-12 *; | [A]EP0515042 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]) [A] 4,5 * column 1, lines 18-58 *; | [Y]DE4225013 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [Y] 3 * column 1, lines 32-54 *; | [XY]WO9734431 (DEUTSCHE TELEKOM MOBIL [DE]) [X] 1,2,6-8 * page 2, lines 4-28 * * page 9, paragraph 3 * * page 51, lines 1-23 * * figures 2,3 * * figures 4.2-1 * [Y] 3; | [A] - SEOKHOON LEE ET AL, "Toward the next generation public traffic information system using Internet", PROCEEDINGS. HIGH PERFORMANCE COMPUTING ON THE INFORMATION SUPERHIGHWAY,XX,XX, (19970428), pages 505 - 510, XP002147421 [A] 8 * page 506, column 1, paragraph 4 - column 2, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/HPC.1997.592199 |