EP1066773 - Slide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 05.02.2010 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2010 | New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked | 05.02.2010 | Revocation of patent | published on 10.03.2010 [2010/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PAUL HETTICH GMBH & CO. Vahrenkampstrasse 12-16 D-32278 Kirchlengern / DE | [2001/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müterthies, Ralf Bennigsfeld 21 32584 Löhne / DE | 02 /
Meyer, Carsten Huchtstrasse 32 33729 Bielefeld / DE | 03 /
Aufderheide, Jörg Diemkerstrasse 82 32139 Spenge / DE | 04 /
Rüter, Stefan Wulferdingser Strasse 65 32549 Bad Oeynhausen / DE | 05 /
Schröder, Gerhard Worthgarten 2 32549 Bad Oeynhausen / DE | 06 /
Dincdemir, Eyyahi Herrendienstweg 104 32120 Hiddenhausen / DE | [2001/02] | Representative(s) | Dantz, Jan Henning, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/02] | Dantz, Jan Henning, et al Jöllenbecker Strasse 164 33613 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 00110761.4 | 19.05.2000 | [2001/02] | Priority number, date | DE1999131842 | 09.07.1999 Original published format: DE 19931842 | [2001/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1066773 | Date: | 10.01.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1066773 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A47B88/14 | [2001/02] | CPC: |
A47B88/487 (EP,US);
A47B88/493 (EP);
A47B2210/001 (EP,US);
A47B2210/0032 (EP,US);
A47B2210/0056 (EP,US);
A47B2210/0059 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/02] | Title | German: | Ausziehführung | [2001/02] | English: | Slide | [2001/02] | French: | Glissière | [2001/02] | Examination procedure | 28.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/34] | 13.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
07.10.2004
18.10.2004
ADMISSIBLE Julius Blum Gesellschaft m.b.H. Industriestrasse 1 A-6973 Hoechst / AT Opponent's representative Torggler, Paul Norbert Torggler & Hofinger Patentanwälte Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.10.2004
Julius Blum Gesellschaft m.b.H. Industriestrasse 1 A-6973 Hoechst / AT Opponent's representative Torggler, Paul N. Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 6020 Innsbruck / AT | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 11.11.2004 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.05.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 11.07.2007 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 23.07.2007 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 13.09.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.10.2009 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2010/10] | 01.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 20.09.2007 | Appeal received No. T1585/07 | 29.11.2007 | Statement of grounds filed | 01.10.2009 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 01.10.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.10.2009 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.01.2004 | IE | 07.01.2004 | FI | 19.05.2004 | LU | 19.05.2004 | SE | 20.05.2004 | BE | 31.05.2004 | MC | 31.05.2004 | DK | 01.06.2004 | PT | 19.11.2004 | GR | 03.12.2004 | CH | 31.05.2007 | LI | 31.05.2007 | [2008/13] |
Former [2007/08] | CY | 07.01.2004 | |
IE | 07.01.2004 | ||
FI | 19.05.2004 | ||
LU | 19.05.2004 | ||
SE | 20.05.2004 | ||
BE | 31.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
DK | 01.06.2004 | ||
PT | 19.11.2004 | ||
GR | 03.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | IE | 07.01.2004 | |
FI | 19.05.2004 | ||
LU | 19.05.2004 | ||
SE | 20.05.2004 | ||
BE | 31.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
DK | 01.06.2004 | ||
PT | 19.11.2004 | ||
GR | 03.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | IE | 07.01.2004 | |
FI | 19.05.2004 | ||
LU | 19.05.2004 | ||
SE | 20.05.2004 | ||
BE | 31.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
PT | 19.11.2004 | ||
GR | 03.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | IE | 07.01.2004 | |
FI | 19.05.2004 | ||
LU | 19.05.2004 | ||
SE | 20.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
PT | 19.11.2004 | ||
GR | 03.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/20] | IE | 07.01.2004 | |
FI | 19.05.2004 | ||
SE | 20.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
PT | 19.11.2004 | ||
GR | 03.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | IE | 07.01.2004 | |
FI | 19.05.2004 | ||
SE | 20.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
GR | 03.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | IE | 07.01.2004 | |
FI | 19.05.2004 | ||
SE | 20.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | IE | 07.01.2004 | |
SE | 20.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/03] | IE | 07.01.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [D]DE3623743 (LAUTENSCHLAEGER KG KARL [DE]); | [XAY]US4752143 (LAUTENSCHLAEGER JR KARL [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,7 * abstract * * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 63 * * figure 1 * [A] 4,9-13 [Y] 6,8; | [A]US5302016 (LAUTENSCHLAEGER GERHARD [DE], et al) [A] 1-13* abstract *; | [DY]DE4443063 (POETTKER GODEHARD [DE]) [DY] 6,8 * column 1, line 14 - line 38 * * figure 1 * | by applicant | DE3127701 | DE3623743 | DE4443063 |