EP1059620 - Piezo effect based security feature on valuable or security documents and detection thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.12.2013 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.01.2014 [2014/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bundesdruckerei GmbH Oranienstrasse 91 10969 Berlin / DE | [2004/43] |
Former [2000/50] | For all designated states BUNDESDRUCKEREI GmbH Oranienstrasse 91 D-10958 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bailleu, Anett Rolandstrasse 56A 13156 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Gutmann, Roland, Dr. Strasse 621/18 12349 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Franz-Burgholz, Armin Hasenheide 73 10967 Berlin / DE | 04 /
Kappe, Frank Kaiserforst 12 33375 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE | 05 /
Ahlers, Benedikt, Dr. Schlesische Strasse 29 10997 Berlin / DE | [2000/50] | Representative(s) | Keil & Schaafhausen Patentanwälte PartGmbB Bockenheimer Landstraße 25 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/08] | KEIL & SCHAAFHAUSEN Patentanwälte Cronstettenstraße 66 60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2006/05] | KEIL & SCHAAFHAUSEN Patentanwälte Cronstettenstrasse 66 60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2003/51] | Haar, Lucas H., Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Haar & Schwarz-Haar, Lessingstrasse 3 61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | ||
Former [2000/50] | Riebling, Peter, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60 88113 Lindau / DE | Application number, filing date | 00110861.2 | 23.05.2000 | [2000/50] | Priority number, date | DE19991026010 | 08.06.1999 Original published format: DE 19926010 | [2000/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1059620 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1059620 | Date: | 20.02.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G07D7/02, G07D7/20 | [2000/50] | CPC: |
G07D7/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/36] |
Former [2000/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Piezo-Effekt-basiertes Sicherheitsmerkmal an Wert- und Sicherheitsdokumenten und dazugehöriges Nachweisverfahren | [2000/50] | English: | Piezo effect based security feature on valuable or security documents and detection thereof | [2000/50] | French: | Caractéristiques de securité basées sur l'effet piézo pour des documents de valeur ou de securité et leur détection | [2000/50] | Examination procedure | 22.02.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/30] | 26.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 03.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.06.2006 | Opposition(s) | 21.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.07.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4763927 (SCHNEIDER WALTER [DE]) [X] 1,2,5-11,14-16 * abstract * * column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 23 * * column 2, line 45 - line 68 * * column 3, line 16 - line 20 * * column 5, line 39 - column 6, line 23 * * figures 1-5 * [A] 3,4,12,13; | [XA]WO9901292 (WHITAKER CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7-9,14,15 * abstract * * page 2, line 1 - line 34 * * figures 1-4 * [A] 3,4,6,10-13,16 |