EP1058342 - A terminal fitting and a production method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2006 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-city Mie 510-8503 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/49] | For all designated states Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-City, Mie, 510-8503 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nimura, Kazuhiko c/o Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14 Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-ken, Mie / JP | 02 /
Aoyama, Masahiko c/o Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14 Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-ken, Mie / JP | 03 /
Kojima, Eiji c/o Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14 Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-ken, Mie / JP | [2000/49] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/49] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00111061.8 | 02.06.2000 | [2000/49] | Priority number, date | JP19990158627 | 04.06.1999 Original published format: JP 15862799 | [2000/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1058342 | Date: | 06.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1058342 | Date: | 13.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/24 | [2000/49] | CPC: |
H01R4/2466 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/34] |
Former [2000/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Anschlusselement und Herstellungsverfahren | [2000/49] | English: | A terminal fitting and a production method | [2000/49] | French: | Organe de contact et procédé de fabrication | [2000/49] | Examination procedure | 15.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/49] | 25.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 13.04.2005 | [2007/35] | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]FR2388421 (BUNKER RAMO [US]) [X] 1,2,8 * page 5, line 4 - line 20 * * page 6, line 7 - line 15; figures 4-8 * [A] 7; | [X]EP0722197 (WHITAKER CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,6,8 * column 3, line 27 - line 38; figures 1-4 * |